This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2021 at 09:13:19 (UTC).

Correll v. Iconic Mortgage Corp.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Correll filed an Other lawsuit against Iconic Mortgage Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cecilia M. Altonaga and Edwin G. Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-24858

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

Referral Judge

Edwin G. Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kirsten Correll

Defendant

Iconic Mortgage Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Avi Robert Kaufman

Attorney at Kaufman P.A.

31 Samana Drive

Miami, FL 33133

William Peter Robinson, III

Attorney at William Robinson, Esq.

1934 Old Gallows Road, Suite 350K

Vienna, VA 22181

Defendant Attorneys

Amy Brown Doolittle

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs LLP (DC)

2550 M Street Nw

Washington, DC 20037

James Allen Peterson

Attorney at Peterson Legal P.A.

401 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 130-550

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Jason Daniel Joffe

Attorney at Squire Sanders & Dempsey LLP

200 S Biscayne Boulevard, 40Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131-2398

 

Court Documents

45 #2

Exhibit A-1 - Iconic Mortgage Sunbiz Information

45 #1

Exhibit A - Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice

#45

(#45) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #32 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Defendant's MOTION to Strike #32 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Iconic Mortgage Corp.. Responses due by 1/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Iconic Mortgage Sunbiz Information)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#44

(#44) ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Steven R. Jaffe. Mediation Hearing set for 6/8/2021 10:00 AM. The parties are reminded that a report of their mediation must be filed within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

43 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#43

(#43) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Steven R. Jaffe as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 06/08/2021 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Avi) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#42

(#42) ORDER re #39 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing filed by Steven R. Jaffe; the parties shall submit a proposed order scheduling mediation in accordance with the procedures outlined in the CM/ECF Procedures. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Steven R. Jaffe as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 06/08/2021 at 10:00 a.m.. (Kaufman, Avi) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#32

(#37) ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint; Iconic Mortgage Corp.. Answer due 1/22/2021. Re: #32 Amended Complaint filed by Kirsten Correll. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order Agreed

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Brown Doolittle on behalf of Iconic Mortgage Corp. (Doolittle, Amy) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kirsten Correll Iconic Mortgage Corp. served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020 (Robinson, William) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

4 #1

Civil Motions Procedures

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Iconic Mortgage Corp. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

(#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Kirsten Correll. (Robinson, William) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Kirsten Correll. (Robinson, William) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Robert J. Krask. #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (bboy, ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #32 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Defendant's MOTION to Strike #32 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Iconic Mortgage Corp.. Responses due by 1/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Iconic Mortgage Sunbiz Information)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Steven R. Jaffe. Mediation Hearing set for 6/8/2021 10:00 AM. The parties are reminded that a report of their mediation must be filed within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Steven R. Jaffe as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 06/08/2021 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Avi) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER re #39 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing filed by Steven R. Jaffe; the parties shall submit a proposed order scheduling mediation in accordance with the procedures outlined in the CM/ECF Procedures. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (mdc) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE by Steven R. Jaffe Notice of Mediation (Jaffe, Steven) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Steven R. Jaffe as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 06/08/2021 at 10:00 a.m.. (Kaufman, Avi) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER granting #36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jason Daniel Joffe representing Iconic Mortgage Corp. (Defendant) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint; Iconic Mortgage Corp.. Answer due 1/22/2021. Re: #32 Amended Complaint filed by Kirsten Correll. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jason Daniel Joffe and Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP for / by Iconic Mortgage Corp.. Responses due by 1/11/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joffe, Jason) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Robert J. Krask. #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (bboy, ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Iconic Mortgage Corp.. (Doolittle, Amy) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Iconic Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed)(Doolittle, Amy) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Brown Doolittle on behalf of Iconic Mortgage Corp. (Doolittle, Amy) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kirsten Correll Iconic Mortgage Corp. served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020 (Robinson, William) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Iconic Mortgage Corp. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Kirsten Correll. (Robinson, William) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Kirsten Correll. (Robinson, William) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7357119.), filed by Kirsten Correll. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robinson, William) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less