This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2021 at 07:07:53 (UTC).

Correlated Magnetics Research, LLC v. Logitech, Inc.

Case Summary

On April 8, 2021,  Correlated Magnetics Research, LLC (“CMR” or “Plaintiff” ),  represented by  Erica J. Van Loon of Lathrop GPM LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against  Logitech Inc. (“Logitech” or “Defendants”), seeking injunctive relief, award of damages, and enhanced damages for allegedly infringing the technology relating to magnetic design owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California with Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi presiding. 

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the Defendant’s alleged wilful infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,314,672 (the “’672 patent”), entitled “Magnetic attachment system having composite magnet structures”, 8,354,909 (the “’909 patent”), entitled “Magnetic attachment system having a non-magnetic region” and 10,173,292 (the “’292 patent”), entitled “Method for assembling a magnetic attachment mechanism” (collectively, “Asserted Patents”) owned by CMR.

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that “CMR invented a new field of magnetic design using complex arrangements of magnetic polarity patterns to achieve unique behaviors. Logitech used CMR’s technology to make accessories that would attach magnetically to Apple’s iPad tablets. CMR invited Logitech to take a license to the patents implicated by Logitech’s products. Logitech refused, and has continued to sell its infringing accessories despite having knowledge that its use of technologies covered by CMR’s valid and enforceable patents was unauthorized and infringing.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged upon information and belief that “Logitech designs, makes and/or instructs manufacturing partners to make products configured to generate magnetic attraction forces to the spine magnets on an Apple iPad tablet.  CMR has licensed its patents to certain third parties. The use, sale or offer for sale of Logitech's products by licensed Logitech resellers is not currently accused of infringing CMR's Asserted Patents. Logitech is not authorized to practice CMR’s asserted patents, nor is Logitech a third party beneficiary of any CMR licenses.” 

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that “CMR’s allegations of infringement are focused solely on Logitech’s manufacture, importation, use, sale and/or offer for sale of products. On information and belief, Logitech sells the Accused Devices through many sales channels that have no relation to CMR’s licensees, including, without limitation, Amazon, Best Buy, and Logitech’s own website, among others. The manufacture, use, offer for sale, sale, or importation of Accused Devices that are not thereafter sold by CMR’s licensees is unauthorized and constitutes infringement under 35 U.S.C. § 271.”

 

There are three claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff; one for the alleged infringement of each of the Asserted Patents, wherein the Plaintiff claimed that without license or authorization and in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(g), Logitech is liable for infringement of one or more claims of each of the Asserted Patents by importing, using, selling, or offering the Accused Devices for sale in the United States. Additionally, the Plaintiff alleged that Logitech has induced and is still inducing infringement of more than one claims of each of the Asserted Patents in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(b) even when it had knowledge of such alleged infringement.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the court to adjudicate that Defendant has infringed the patents owned by Plaintiff, and to award damages with pre and post judgment interest along with enhanced damages pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284. Plaintiff further requested the court for an injunctive relief and an award of CMR’s costs and reasonable attorneys’ fees.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.










Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02554

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Virginia K. DeMarchi

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Correlated Magnetics Research, LLC

Defendant

Logitech, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erica J. Van Loon

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3500S

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Change of Address by Erica J. Van Loon (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#12

(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

11 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#11

(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 4/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Correlated Magnetics Research, LLC.. (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#8

(#8) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Logitech, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#4

(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patents (cc: form mailed to register). (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#3

(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Correlated Magnetics Research, LLC (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Logitech, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15812363.). Filed byCorrelated Magnetics Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

3 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Change of Address by Erica J. Van Loon (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 4/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Correlated Magnetics Research, LLC.. (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Logitech, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patents (cc: form mailed to register). (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Correlated Magnetics Research, LLC (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Logitech, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15812363.). Filed byCorrelated Magnetics Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Logitech Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erica J. Van Loon