This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/01/2019 at 07:37:11 (UTC).

Corral Boot Company, LLC v. Rural Haze, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 Corral Boot Company, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Rural Haze, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Micaela Alvarez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00224

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Micaela Alvarez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Corral Boot Company, LLC

1801 South 2Nd St., Ste. 460

Mcallen, TX 78503

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Jane Cochrane

Rural Haze, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Richard D Schell

Attorney at Law Office of Richard D Schell

1801 S 2Nd St, Ste 460

Mcallen, TX 78503

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Joel Joseph Vale, Jr

Attorney at Atlas Hall & Rodriguez LLP

818 W Pecan Blvd

Mcallen, TX 78501

Charles C Murray

Attorney at Atlas & Hall

818 Pecan

Mcallen, TX 78501

Adriana H Cardenas

Attorney at Atlas, Hall & Rodriguez, LLP

Po Drawer 3725

Mcallen, TX 78502

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

11 #1

Supplement

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #7

Exhibit Citation-Rural Haze

1 #4

Exhibit Docket Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit List of Counsel

1 #2

Exhibit Index of Matters

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SCHEDULING ORDER. Pltf Expert Report due by 1/18/2020. Deft Expert Report due by 3/1/2020. Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 5/14/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/13/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Micaela Alvarez. Initial PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/13/2019. The parties appeared before the Court for an initial pre-trial scheduling conference. The Court proceeded to delineate scheduling deadlines with a written order to follow. Appearances:Richard Schell / Adriana Cardenas (ERO: Xavier Avalos [9:34-9:46]) (DUSM: J. Sedia)., filed.(JulieSanchez,hs 7) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(AdrianDeLaRosa, 7) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Corral Boot Company, LLC, filed.(Schell, Richard) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Supplemental CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jane Cochrane, Rural Haze, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Cardenas, Adriana) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jane Cochrane, Rural Haze, LLC, filed.(Cardenas, Adriana) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Jane Cochrane, Rural Haze, LLC, filed.(Cardenas, Adriana) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Corral Boot Company, LLC, filed.(Schell, Richard) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER re: #6 Certificate of Interested Parties, #5 Certificate of Interested Parties (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Corral Boot Company, LLC, filed.(Schell, Richard) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jane Cochrane, Rural Haze, LLC, filed.(Cardenas, Adriana) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jane Cochrane, Rural Haze, LLC, filed.(Cardenas, Adriana) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Corral Boot Company, LLC by Jane Cochrane, Rural Haze, LLC, filed.(Cardenas, Adriana) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 139th District Court of Hidalgo County, Texas, case number C-2326-19-C (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22725777) filed by Jane Cochrane, Rural Haze, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index of Matters, #3 Exhibit List of Counsel, #4 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit Plf's Original Petition from State Court, #6 Exhibit Citation-Kasper, #7 Exhibit Citation-Rural Haze)(Vale, Joel) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less