This case was last updated from PACER on 08/14/2019 at 07:00:45 (UTC).

Corrado v. Cushman & Wakefield Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2019 Corrado filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Cushman Wakefield Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05614

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nadine Corrado

Defendant

Cushman & Wakefield Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zachary J Liszka

Attorney at Liszka and Gray, LLC

1180 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorney

Christopher J. Kelly

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

210 Lake Drive East, Suite 200

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liszka, Zachary) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nadine Corrado. (Liszka, Zachary) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher J. Kelly on behalf of Cushman & Wakefield Inc.. (Kelly, Christopher) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cushman & Wakefield Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17091725)Document filed by Nadine Corrado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit Wage Notice)(Liszka, Zachary) (Entered: 06/15/2019)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Cushman & Wakefield Inc.. (Kelly, Christopher) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#8

(#8) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 7/22/2019. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/13/2016) (mf) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff NADINE CORRADO and Defendant CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC. that Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 1) is hereby extended to August 23, 2019. SO ORDERED. Cushman & Wakefield Inc. answer due 8/23/2019. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/2/2019) (rj) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Employment Agreement

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cushman & Wakefield Inc.. (dnh) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Wage Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for 9/26/19 10 AM at Mediator's office.(smc) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 8/22/2019.(ah) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 7/22/2019. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/13/2016) (mf) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher J. Kelly on behalf of Cushman & Wakefield Inc.. (Kelly, Christopher) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff NADINE CORRADO and Defendant CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC. that Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 1) is hereby extended to August 23, 2019. SO ORDERED. Cushman & Wakefield Inc. answer due 8/23/2019. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/2/2019) (rj) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Cushman & Wakefield Inc.. (Kelly, Christopher) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cushman & Wakefield Inc.. (dnh) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nadine Corrado. (Liszka, Zachary) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liszka, Zachary) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Zachary J Liszka. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Cushman & Wakefield Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17091725)Document filed by Nadine Corrado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit Wage Notice)(Liszka, Zachary) (Entered: 06/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.