This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:30:16 (UTC).

Corporal v. Butler et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Corporal filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Butler. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah K. Chasanow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-03490

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Deborah K. Chasanow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Corporal

Cumberland, MD 21502

Defendants

Security Chief Butler

Lt. J. Smith

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Butler, J. Smith, filed by Jeffrey Corporal. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER directing Plaintiff to inform the court of any change of address; directing the Finance Officer to file an inmate account summary information sheet for the past 6 months within 21 days. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 12/23/2019. (c/m ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER directing Plaintiff to inform the court of any change of address; directing the Finance Officer to file an inmate account summary information sheet for the past 6 months within 21 days. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 12/23/2019. (c/m ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffrey Corporal(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Butler, J. Smith, filed by Jeffrey Corporal. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.