This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 08:14:17 (UTC).

Corona v. Quiktrip Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Corona filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Quiktrip Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00171

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ivan Corona

Defendants

Quiktrip Corporation

ABC Corp.

John Does 1-5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph D. Perrotta

Attorney at Monge & Associaes

8205 Dunwoody Place, Building 19

Atlanta, GA 30350

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Robb Cruser

Attorney at Cruser, Mitchell, Novitz, Sanchez, Gaston & Zimet, LLP

Meridian Ii, Suite 2000, 275 Scientific Drive

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

Candice Renee Bryant

Attorney at Cruser Mitchell Law Firm

Suite 2000, 275 Scientific Dr., N.W.

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Quiktrip Corporation. (jra) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Quiktrip Corporation. Quiktrip Corporation waiver mailed on 1/17/2022, answer due 3/18/2022. (Bryant, Candice) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Quiktrip Corporation. Discovery ends on 7/8/2022.(Bryant, Candice) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons by Quiktrip Corporation. (Bryant, Candice) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 3/31/22 thru 4/1/22, 7/1/22 thru7/11/22, 11/18/22 thru 11/28/22, 12/16/22 thru 1/3/23, by Joseph D. Perrotta. (Perrotta, Joseph) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#8

(#8) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Quiktrip Corporation. (Bryant, Candice) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is assigned to an eight-month discovery track. Discovery ends on 11/8/2022. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/3/2022. (dob) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#10

(#10) Initial Disclosures by Quiktrip Corporation.(Bryant, Candice) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Initial Disclosures by Quiktrip Corporation.(Bryant, Candice) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is assigned to an eight-month discovery track. Discovery ends on 11/8/2022. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/3/2022. (dob) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Quiktrip Corporation. (Bryant, Candice) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 3/31/22 thru 4/1/22, 7/1/22 thru7/11/22, 11/18/22 thru 11/28/22, 12/16/22 thru 1/3/23, by Joseph D. Perrotta. (Perrotta, Joseph) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons by Quiktrip Corporation. (Bryant, Candice) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Quiktrip Corporation. Discovery ends on 7/8/2022.(Bryant, Candice) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Quiktrip Corporation. Quiktrip Corporation waiver mailed on 1/17/2022, answer due 3/18/2022. (Bryant, Candice) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Quiktrip Corporation. (jra) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ivan Corona. (Filing fee $402, receipt number BGANDC-11518660) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QuikTrip Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Candice Renee Bryant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Robb Cruser