This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2021 at 13:18:20 (UTC).

Cornwell v. Terrebonne Parish Criminal Justice Center et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Cornwell filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Terrebonne Parish Criminal Justice Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Ivan L.R. Lemelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03124

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Ivan L.R. Lemelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benjamin J Cornwell

Houma, LA 70363

Defendants

Terrebonne Parish Criminal Justice Center

Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government Medical Staff

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $.80 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Benjamin J. Cornwell in monthly payments as set out in document. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court terminate the deficiencies assigned to Cornwell's #1 Complaint and #2 Pauper Application for purposes of entering this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to WITHHOLD issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc: Warden; NEF: Financial) (mp) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#6

(#6) Response/Reply to Deficiency Notice of #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin J Cornwell. (pp) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#5

(#5) Response/Reply to Deficiency Notice of #1 Complaint by Benjamin J Cornwell. (pp) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 12/9/2020. (pp) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#2

(#2) **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin J Cornell. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (pp) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) **DEFICIENT**COMPLAINT against Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government Medical Staff, Terrebonne Parish Criminal Justice Center filed by Benjamin J Cornell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pp) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $.80 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Benjamin J. Cornwell in monthly payments as set out in document. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court terminate the deficiencies assigned to Cornwell's #1 Complaint and #2 Pauper Application for purposes of entering this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to WITHHOLD issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc: Warden; NEF: Financial) (mp) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Response/Reply to Deficiency Notice of #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin J Cornwell. (pp) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Response/Reply to Deficiency Notice of #1 Complaint by Benjamin J Cornwell. (pp) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 12/9/2020. (pp) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin J Cornell. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (pp) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) **DEFICIENT**COMPLAINT against Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government Medical Staff, Terrebonne Parish Criminal Justice Center filed by Benjamin J Cornell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pp) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government Medical Staff is a litigant

Latest cases where Terrebonne Parish Criminal Justice Complex is a litigant