Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/29/2019 at 08:39:42 (UTC).

Cornett-Cochran v. Tennessee State Veterans Home Board

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 Cornett-Cochran filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Tennessee State Veterans Home Board. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eli J. Richardson and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00766

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Megan Cornett-Cochran

Defendant

Tennessee State Veterans Home Board

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paige M. Lyle

Attorney at Collins & Hunter PLLC

7000 Executive Center Drive, Building Two Suite 320

Brentwood, TN 37027

Anne Hunter Williams

Attorney at Collins & Hunter PLLC

7000 Executive Center Drive, Building Two Suite 320

Brentwood, TN 37027

Heather M. Collins

Attorney at Collins & Hunter PLLC

7000 Executive Center Drive, Building Two Suite 320

Brentwood, TN 37027

Defendant Attorney

Rachel A. Newton

Tennessee Attorney General'S Office, P O Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202-0207

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motions to Amend due by 2/3/2020. Discovery due by 8/18/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/5/2020. Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/23/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/28/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) Modified Text on 10/28/2019 (am). (Main Document 16 replaced on 10/28/2019) (am). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Megan Cornett-Cochran. (Collins, Heather) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#14

(#14) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Joint filed by Megan Cornett-Cochran. (Lyle, Paige) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference RESET for 10/28/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER: On October 10, 2019, Defendant Tennessee State Veterans Home Board filed a motion to dismiss the complaint in part. (Doc. No. #10 .) Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Richardson unless referred to the undersigned magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/11/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Tennessee State Veterans Home Board . (Newton, Rachel) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#10

(#10) Partial MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Tennessee State Veterans Home Board. (Newton, Rachel) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Tennessee State Veterans Home Board, answer due 10/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/25/2019. (mg) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint - Unopposed by Tennessee State Veterans Home Board. (Newton, Rachel) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Megan Cornett-Cochran. Tennessee State Veterans Home Board served on 9/6/2019. (Williams, Anne) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/3/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons issued as to Tennessee State Veterans Home Board. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Tennessee State Veterans Home Board (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2983649), filed by Megan Cornett-Cochran. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motions to Amend due by 2/3/2020. Discovery due by 8/18/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/5/2020. Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/23/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/28/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) Modified Text on 10/28/2019 (am). (Main Document 16 replaced on 10/28/2019) (am). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/28/2019. (Hearing lasted :14)(tm) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Megan Cornett-Cochran. (Collins, Heather) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Joint filed by Megan Cornett-Cochran. (Lyle, Paige) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference RESET for 10/28/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: On October 10, 2019, Defendant Tennessee State Veterans Home Board filed a motion to dismiss the complaint in part. (Doc. No. #10 .) Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Richardson unless referred to the undersigned magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/11/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Tennessee State Veterans Home Board . (Newton, Rachel) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Partial MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Tennessee State Veterans Home Board. (Newton, Rachel) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Tennessee State Veterans Home Board, answer due 10/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/25/2019. (mg) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint - Unopposed by Tennessee State Veterans Home Board. (Newton, Rachel) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Megan Cornett-Cochran. Tennessee State Veterans Home Board served on 9/6/2019. (Williams, Anne) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/3/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons issued as to Tennessee State Veterans Home Board. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Heather M. Collins, Paige M. Lyle, and Anne Hunter Williams. (mg) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Tennessee State Veterans Home Board (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2983649), filed by Megan Cornett-Cochran. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel A. Newton