This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/05/2021 at 08:29:31 (UTC).

Cornerstone Church of Nashville, Inc. v. Guideone Insurance

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 Cornerstone Church of Nashville, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Guideone Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aleta A. Trauger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00956

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aleta A. Trauger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cornerstone Church of Nashville, Inc.

Cornerstone Church (Assemblies of God), Inc.

Defendants

Guideone Insurance

GuideOne Elite Insurance Company

GuideOne National Insurance Company

GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company

GuideOne Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Radford Harlan Dimmick

Po Box 198588

Nashville, TN 37201-1623

Defendant Attorney

William R. Johnson

Attorney at Tyson & Mendes

1616 Westgate Circle, Suite 330

Brentwood, TN 37027

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#10

9 #2

Exhibit Liability Insurance Policy issued by GuideOne to Cornerstone Church

9 #1

Exhibit Underlying Complaint: Davidson County Circuit Court, Docket No. 16C1131,

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Second MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law, #8 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Motion filed by Cornerstone Church of Nashville, Inc.. (Dimmick, Radford) (Entered: 01/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss Complaint [Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6)] (Doc. No. #13 ) is GRANTED. The plaintiff shall respond to the pending Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. #8 ) by January 5, 2021, and the defendant may file a reply by January 22, 2021. It is further ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for January 11, 2021 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, after disposition of this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/02/2020. (ln) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Cornerstone Church of Nashville, Inc. (Dimmick, Radford) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cornerstone Church of Nashville, Inc. (Dimmick, Radford) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Guideone Insurance. (Johnson, William) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***DISREGARD. Incorrect form.*** BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Guideone Insurance. (Johnson, William) Modified on 12/2/2020 (ln). (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Memorandum of Law by Guideone Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Underlying Complaint: Davidson County Circuit Court, Docket No. 16C1131, captioned James Clint Arnold v. Cornerstone Church of Nashville, Inc. f/k/a Cornerstone Church (Assemblies of God), Inc., and Brian Lance Mitchell., #2 Exhibit Liability Insurance Policy issued by GuideOne to Cornerstone Church)(Johnson, William) Modified on 12/2/2020 (ln). (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Motion by Guideone Insurance. (Johnson, William) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Motion (DE #6 ) DENIED AS MOOT - no motion on file. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/24/2020. (ln) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Cornerstone Church of Nashville, Inc. (Dimmick, Radford) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COUNSEL: All filings must be filed electronically and NOT through drop box mailing. If you do not have ECF access, please secure your credentials as soon as practical. All drop box filings shall be returned.*** (mg) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from William R. Johnson regarding disc. (mg) Modified on 11/13/2020 (mg). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2021 at 4:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL William R. Johnson: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 11/30/2020. (mg) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Radford Harlan Dimmick, admitted to this court. William R. Johnson admitted to this court on 11/23/2020. (mg) Modified on 12/1/2020 to update Mr. Johnston's status. (ds) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Johnson on behalf of Guideone Insurance. (mg) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Guideone Insurance from Chancery Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 20-791-III. (Fee Paid) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(mg) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUIDEONE INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GuideOne Elite Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GUIDEONE SPECIALTY MUTUAL INSURANCE AS SUBROGEE OF PARK BIXBY TOWER INC. is a litigant