This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/15/2021 at 19:31:12 (UTC).

Cornell v. Hakkasan Holdings LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 Cornell filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Hakkasan Holdings LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy J. Koppe and James C. Mahan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02143

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryan Cornell

Defendants

Hakkasan Limited

Hakkasan Holdings LLC

Hakkasan Texas Holdings, LLC

Bijou, LLC

Hakkasan LV LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael P. Balaban

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael P. Balaban

10726 Del Rudini St

Las Vegas, NV 89141-4216

Defendant Attorneys

Amy L Thompson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3960 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Montgomery Y Paek

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3960 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89169

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#15

#14

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #23 Stipulation; Discovery due by 9/7/2021. Motions due by 10/7/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery re #15 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Defendant Hakkasan Holdings LLC. (Thompson, Amy) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER Re: #21 Order on Stipulated Protective Order. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PROTECTIVE ORDER. ORDER granting #20 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendant Hakkasan Holdings LLC. (Thompson, Amy) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docket(#19) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Neutral Evaluation session held on 2/10/2021 before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Pla Counsel: Michael P. Balaban; Def Counsel: Amy L Thompson; Time of Hearing: 9:00 AM to 11:06 AM. In addition to counsel, plaintiff Bryan Cornell was present. Also, Executive Director of Legal Affairs, Deanna Brinkerhoff, was present on behalf of defendant. The court heard presentations from counsel and the parties and met with each side in caucuses. Offers and counteroffers were exchanged. A settlement was not reached. Counsel may jointly contact Magistrate Judge Weksler's chambers to request an additional settlement conference if they agree that her participation in additional discussions would be helpful. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DCh) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket(#18) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Pre-ENE Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/9/2021 before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Pla Counsel: Michael P. Balaban; Def Counsel: Amy L Thompson; Time of Hearing: 2:30 PM to 2:36 PM. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DCh) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/8/2021. Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, IT IS ORDERED that the 2/9/2021 pre-ENE telephonic status conference is ADVANCED in time only to 2/9/2021 at 2:30 PM. This telephonic conference is for Judge Weksler and counsel only. Counsel must call 877-810-9415, access code 2365998, five minutes before the telephonic conference. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DCh) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/6/2021. Motions due by 8/5/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hakkasan Holdings LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Hakkasan USA, Inc. for Hakkasan Holdings LLC added. (Paek, Montgomery) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint filed by Hakkasan Holdings LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/21/2021.(Thompson, Amy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Response to #5 Amended Complaint. Hakkasan Holdings LLC answer due 1/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #5 Amended Complaint by Defendant Hakkasan Holdings LLC. (Thompson, Amy) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Bryan Cornell. Removes parties. (Balaban, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bryan Cornell. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Balaban, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (HAM) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (HAM) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6265445) by Bryan Cornell. Proof of service due by 2/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (Balaban, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hakkasan Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Hakkasan Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Montgomery Y Paek

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy L Thompson