Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/11/2019 at 08:02:14 (UTC).

Corley v. Charleston County

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 Corley filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Charleston County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bristow Marchant and Margaret B Seymour. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00082

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bristow Marchant

Presiding Judge

Margaret B Seymour

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saisah G Corley

Defendant

Charleston County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bonnie Travaglio Hunt

Attorney at Hunt Law

Po Box 1845

Goose Creek, SC 29445

Defendant Attorneys

Bob J Conley

Attorney at Cleveland and Conley

171 Church Street, Suite 310

Charleston, SC 29401

Caroline Wrenn Cleveland

Attorney at Caroline Wrenn Cleveland Law Office

171 Church Street, Suite 310

Charleston, SC 29401

Emmanuel Joseph Ferguson

Attorney at Cleveland and Conley

171 Church Street, Suite 310

Charleston, SC 29401

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/12/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 2/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/5/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/9/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/9/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/9/2019, Discovery due by 10/9/2019, Motions due by 12/16/2019, Mediation Due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 02/14/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#12

(#12) CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 02/14/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

11 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Confidentiality Order

#11

(#11) Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Charleston County. Response to Motion due by 2/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Confidentiality Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Ferguson, Emmanuel) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#10

(#10) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Charleston County.(Ferguson, Emmanuel) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#9

(#9) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Charleston County.(Ferguson, Emmanuel) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#8

(#8) Joint Rule 26(F) Discovery Plan Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Charleston County.(Ferguson, Emmanuel) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit A. Witness List

#6

(#6) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/29/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/12/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 2/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/5/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/5/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/6/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/6/2019, Discovery due by 7/5/2019, Motions due by 9/5/2019, Mediation Due by 8/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 01/16/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#5

(#5) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Saisah G Corley.(Hunt, Bonnie) (Entered: 01/13/2019)

4 #1

Supporting Documents

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Charleston County. (egra, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2019: #1 Supporting Documents) (egra, ). Modified on 1/11/2019 to add attachment (egra, ). (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charleston County. (egra, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-cp-10-05701. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8203684), filed by Charleston County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (egra, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/12/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 2/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/5/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/9/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/9/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/9/2019, Discovery due by 10/9/2019, Motions due by 12/16/2019, Mediation Due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 02/14/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 02/14/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Charleston County. Response to Motion due by 2/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Confidentiality Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Ferguson, Emmanuel) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Charleston County.(Ferguson, Emmanuel) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Charleston County.(Ferguson, Emmanuel) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint Rule 26(F) Discovery Plan Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Charleston County.(Ferguson, Emmanuel) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Saisah G Corley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Witness List)(Hunt, Bonnie) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/29/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/12/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 2/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/5/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/5/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/6/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/6/2019, Discovery due by 7/5/2019, Motions due by 9/5/2019, Mediation Due by 8/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 01/16/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Saisah G Corley.(Hunt, Bonnie) (Entered: 01/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Charleston County. (egra, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2019: #1 Supporting Documents) (egra, ). Modified on 1/11/2019 to add attachment (egra, ). (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charleston County. (egra, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-cp-10-05701. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8203684), filed by Charleston County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (egra, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less