This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2020 at 09:26:33 (UTC).

Corkrean v. Drake University et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 Corkrean filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Drake University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Celeste F. Bremer and Charles R. Wolle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00336

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Celeste F. Bremer

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Wolle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Margaret Corkrean

Defendants

Drake University

Gesine Gerhard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Megan C. Flynn

Attorney at COPPOLA MCCONVILLE CARROLL

2100 Westown Parkway, Suite 210

West Des Moines, IA 50265

Michael J. Carroll

Attorney at COPPOLA MCCONVILLE CARROLL

2100 Westown Parkway, Suite 210

West Des Moines, IA 50265

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Elizabeth Reif

Attorney at AHLERS & COONEY

100 Court Avenue, Suite 600

Des Moines, IA 50309

Olivia Diane Brooks

Attorney at AHLERS & COONEY

100 Court Avenue, Suite 600

Des Moines, IA 50309

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Drake University. (Reif, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Drake University, Gesine Gerhard.(Reif, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

1 #1

Local Rule 81(a) List on Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gesine Gerhard, Drake University from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL148777. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4287510., filed by Gesine Gerhard, Drake University. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 81(a) List on Removal)(Reif, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Drake University. (Reif, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Drake University, Gesine Gerhard.(Reif, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gesine Gerhard, Drake University from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL148777. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4287510., filed by Gesine Gerhard, Drake University. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 81(a) List on Removal)(Reif, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan C. Flynn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael John Carroll