This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/26/2022 at 11:02:21 (UTC).

Coretek Licensing LLC v. Zocdoc, Inc.,

Case Summary

On 07/28/2022 Coretek Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Zocdoc, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06424

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coretek Licensing LLC

Defendant

Zocdoc, Inc.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew S. Curfman

Defendant Attorney

Frank A. Bruno

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank A. Bruno on behalf of Zocdoc, Inc.,..(Bruno, Frank) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Andrew S. Curfman dated August 15, 2022.. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/16/2022) Zocdoc, Inc., answer due 10/10/2022 (ks) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

7 #3

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

7 #2

Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing

7 #1

Exhibit Declaration

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zocdoc, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#4

(#4) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Andrew S. Curfman re: that this action be filed as related to 1:22-cv-06422. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

1 #8

Exhibit H-'551 Claim Chart

1 #7

Exhibit G-'575 Claim Chart

1 #6

Exhibit F-'154 Claim Chart

1 #4

Exhibit D-US9591551

1 #3

Exhibit C-US9369575

1 #2

Exhibit B-US9173154

1 #1

Exhibit A-US8861512

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/29/2022 adjourned to 10/19/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank A. Bruno on behalf of Zocdoc, Inc.,..(Bruno, Frank) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Andrew S. Curfman dated August 15, 2022.. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/16/2022) Zocdoc, Inc., answer due 10/10/2022 (ks) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Andrew S. Curfman dated August 15, 2022. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Zocdoc, Inc., served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022. Service was accepted by Minard Carkner, Service of Process. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/29/2022 at 12:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-06422-JGK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andrew S. Curfman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 18:1341. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 35:0001. (sj) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Andrew S Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26478139. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Andrew S Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26478139. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zocdoc, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Andrew S. Curfman re: that this action be filed as related to 1:22-cv-06422. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Zocdoc, Inc.,. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26477973)Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8861512, #2 Exhibit B-US9173154, #3 Exhibit C-US9369575, #4 Exhibit D-US9591551, #5 Exhibit E-'512 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F-'154 Claim Chart, #7 Exhibit G-'575 Claim Chart, #8 Exhibit H-'551 Claim Chart).(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less