1:22-CV-06424
07/28/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Patent
John G. Koeltl
Coretek Licensing LLC
Zocdoc, Inc.,
Andrew S. Curfman
Frank A. Bruno
(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank A. Bruno on behalf of Zocdoc, Inc.,..(Bruno, Frank) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
(#12) ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Andrew S. Curfman dated August 15, 2022.. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/16/2022) Zocdoc, Inc., answer due 10/10/2022 (ks) (Entered: 08/16/2022)
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing
Exhibit Declaration
Main Document
(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zocdoc, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
(#4) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
(#3) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Andrew S. Curfman re: that this action be filed as related to 1:22-cv-06422. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
Exhibit H-'551 Claim Chart
Exhibit G-'575 Claim Chart
Exhibit F-'154 Claim Chart
Exhibit D-US9591551
Exhibit C-US9369575
Exhibit B-US9173154
Exhibit A-US8861512
DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/29/2022 adjourned to 10/19/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank A. Bruno on behalf of Zocdoc, Inc.,..(Bruno, Frank) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Andrew S. Curfman dated August 15, 2022.. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/16/2022) Zocdoc, Inc., answer due 10/10/2022 (ks) (Entered: 08/16/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Andrew S. Curfman dated August 15, 2022. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/15/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Zocdoc, Inc., served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022. Service was accepted by Minard Carkner, Service of Process. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/15/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/29/2022 at 12:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 08/09/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 08/03/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 08/03/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-06422-JGK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) (Entered: 08/03/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andrew S. Curfman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 18:1341. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 35:0001. (sj) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Andrew S Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26478139. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) MOTION for Andrew S Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26478139. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zocdoc, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Andrew S. Curfman re: that this action be filed as related to 1:22-cv-06422. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT against Zocdoc, Inc.,. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26477973)Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8861512, #2 Exhibit B-US9173154, #3 Exhibit C-US9369575, #4 Exhibit D-US9591551, #5 Exhibit E-'512 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F-'154 Claim Chart, #7 Exhibit G-'575 Claim Chart, #8 Exhibit H-'551 Claim Chart).(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
[-] Read Less