This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/26/2022 at 10:04:01 (UTC).

Coretek Licensing LLC v. Teladoc Health, Inc.

Case Summary

On July 28, 2022, Coretek Licensing LLC  (“Plaintiff”), represented by Andrew S. Curfman of Sand, Sebolt & Wernow Co., LPA, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Teladoc Health, Inc. (“Defendant”), seeking declaratory and injunctive relief with damages, for Defendant’s alleged infringement of patents-in-suit owned by plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York with Judge John G. Koeltl presiding.

This plaintiff filed this action for the alleged infringement of the U.S. Patent Nos. 8,861,512 (“the ‘512 Patent”); U.S. Patent No. 9,173,154 (“the ‘154 Patent”); U.S. Patent No. 9,369,575 (“the ‘575 Patent”); and U.S. Patent No. 9,591,551 (“the ‘551 Patent”) (collectively the “Patents-in-Suit”).

In the complaint, the plaintiff claimed, “Plaintiff is presently the owner of the ‘512 Patent, having received all right, title and interest in and to the ‘512 Patent from the previous assignee of record. Plaintiff possesses all rights of recovery under the ‘512 Patent, including the exclusive right to recover for past infringement.”

The plaintiff alleged, “Defendant commercializes, inter alia, methods that perform all the steps recited in at least one claim of the ‘512 Patent. More particularly, Defendant commercializes, inter alia, methods, systems, and/or servers that perform all the steps recited in Claims 1, 4, 5, 8, 12, 23, and/or 24 of the ‘512 Patent.”

The plaintiff further alleged, “Defendant has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe at least one claim of the ‘512 Patent by using, at least through internal testing or otherwise, the Accused Product without authority in the United States, and will continue to do so unless enjoined by this Court.”

The plaintiff also alleged, “Defendant has induced others to infringe the ‘512 Patent by encouraging infringement, knowing that the acts Defendant induced constituted patent infringement, and its encouraging acts actually resulted in direct patent infringement.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “Defendant has committed these acts of infringement without license or authorization.”

The plaintiff additionally alleged, “As a result of Defendant’s infringement of the ‘512 Patent Plaintiff has suffered monetary damages and is entitled to a monetary judgment in an amount adequate to compensate for Defendant’s past infringement, together with interests and costs.”

The plaintiff has alleged similar claims against other patents as well.

The plaintiff presented four claims for relief, including claims for the alleged infringement of the patents-in-suit.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested a judgment seeking declaratory relief, a permanent injunction, an award of damages, pre- and post-judgment interest, and costs against Defendant, together with an award of such interest and costs, in accordance with 35 U.S.C. §284.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06422

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coretek Licensing LLC

Defendant

Teladoc Health, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew S. Curfman

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Andrew S. Curfman dated August 24, 2022., #1 Complaint. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Teladoc Health, Inc. answer due 9/26/2022. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/25/2022) (rro) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#12

(#12) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Andrew S. Curfman dated August 24, 2022. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Teladoc Health, Inc. served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Andrew S Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/16/2022) (ks) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#9

(#9) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

1 #8

Exhibit H-'551 Claim Chart

1 #7

Exhibit G-'575 Claim Chart

1 #6

Exhibit F-'154 Claim Chart

1 #5

Exhibit E-'512 Claim Chart

1 #4

Exhibit D-US9591551

1 #3

Exhibit C-US9369575

1 #2

Exhibit B-US9173154

1 #1

Exhibit A-US8861512

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/30/2022 adjourned to 10/19/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Andrew S. Curfman dated August 24, 2022., #1 Complaint. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Teladoc Health, Inc. answer due 9/26/2022. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/25/2022) (rro) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Andrew S. Curfman dated August 24, 2022. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Teladoc Health, Inc. served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Andrew S Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/16/2022) (ks) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/29/2022 at 12:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-05556-JGK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andrew S. Curfman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 18:1341. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 35:0001. (sj) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Andrew S Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26477758. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Andrew S Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26477758. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teladoc Health, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Andrew S. Curfman re: that this action be filed as related to 1:22-cv-05556-JGK. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Teladoc Health, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26477557)Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8861512, #2 Exhibit B-US9173154, #3 Exhibit C-US9369575, #4 Exhibit D-US9591551, #5 Exhibit E-'512 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F-'154 Claim Chart, #7 Exhibit G-'575 Claim Chart, #8 Exhibit H-'551 Claim Chart).(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less