This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2021 at 09:58:43 (UTC).

Coretek Licensing LLC v. Plantronics, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Coretek Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Plantronics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher J. Burke and Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01607

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher J. Burke

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coretek Licensing LLC

Defendant

Plantronics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Andrew S. Curfman

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer complaint to 02/22/2021 - filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 01/21/2021 - filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coretek Licensing LLC. Plantronics, Inc. served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (myr) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,861,512 ;US 9,173,154 ;US 9,369,575 ;US 9,591,551. (myr) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT filed with Jury Demand against Plantronics, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3355781.) - filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED D.I. #10 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer complaint to 02/22/2021 filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/19/2020. (dlb) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer complaint to 02/22/2021 - filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED D.I. #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 01/21/2021 filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/15/2020. (dlb) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 01/21/2021 - filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coretek Licensing LLC. Plantronics, Inc. served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew S. Curfman for Coretek Licensing LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01607-MN-CJB, 1:20-cv-01594-MN-CJB, 1:20-cv-01597-MN-CJB, 1:20-cv-01604-MN-CJB, 1:20-cv-01606-MN-CJB(kmd) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docket(#7) ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pre-trial matters up to and including expert discovery matters (but not including summary judgment motions, Daubert motions, pre-trial motions in limine or the pre-trial conference), subject to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and any further Order of the Court. All subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 20-1607-MN-CJB. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/3/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketSO ORDERED re (6 in 1:20-cv-01604-MN), (6 in 1:20-cv-01606-MN), (6 in 1:20-cv-01594-MN), (6 in 1:20-cv-01607-MN), (6 in 1:20-cv-01597-MN) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/3/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01594-MN, 1:20-cv-01597-MN, 1:20-cv-01604-MN, 1:20-cv-01606-MN, 1:20-cv-01607-MN (rjb) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman - filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (myr) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,861,512 ;US 9,173,154 ;US 9,369,575 ;US 9,591,551. (myr) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT filed with Jury Demand against Plantronics, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3355781.) - filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Plantronics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Coretek Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S. Curfman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimmy C. Chong