This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2022 at 08:28:14 (UTC).

Coretek Licensing LLC v. Live Learning Technologies Shared Resources LLC

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Coretek Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Live Learning Technologies Shared Resources LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Jones. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00226

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coretek Licensing LLC

Defendants

Live Learning Technologies Shared Resources, LLC

Live Learning Technologies Shared Resources LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philip P Mann

Attorney at MANN LAW GROUP PLLC

403 Madison Ave N, Ste 240

Bainbridge Island, WA 98110

Andrew S Curfman

Attorney at SAND SEBOLT & WERNOW CO LPA

4940 Munson St Nw, Aegis Tower Ste 1100

Canton, OH 44718

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Coretek Licensing LLC (Mann, Philip) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#6

(#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew S. Curfman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Coretek Licensing LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7461875 (Mann, Philip) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#4

(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (JWC) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Live Learning Technologies Shared Resources LLC (JWC) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Coretek Licensing LLC (Mann, Philip) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

1 #11

Supplement

1 #10

Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. Civil case dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Plaintiff's #8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (VE) (Entered: 03/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Coretek Licensing LLC (Mann, Philip) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew S Curfman for Plaintiff Coretek Licensing LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew S. Curfman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Coretek Licensing LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7461875 (Mann, Philip) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (JWC) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Live Learning Technologies Shared Resources LLC (JWC) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketJudge Richard A. Jones added. (JWC) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Coretek Licensing LLC (Mann, Philip) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against defendant(s) Live Learning Technologies Shared Resources, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7454093) Attorney Philip P Mann added to party Coretek Licensing LLC(pty:pla), filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #11 SummonsSupplement)(Mann, Philip) Modified on 3/1/2022 to correct summons label (JWC). (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Coretek Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip P Mann

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S. Curfman