This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2022 at 17:11:57 (UTC).

Coretek Licensing LLC v. Discord Inc.

Case Summary

On February 26, 2021, Coretek Licensing LLC (“Plaintiff” or “Coretek”), represented by Jimmy C. Chong of The Chong Law Firm, P.A. filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Discord Inc. (“Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief, damages among other reliefs for allegedly infringing Coretek’s intellectual property relating to Method of Enabling a Wireless Device to Make a Network Connection Without Using a Network Operator’s Home Location Register and various other technologies. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the District of Delaware with Judge Christopher J. Burke and Maryellen Noreika presiding.

The Plaintiff alleged that the Defendants have infringed one or more claims under United States Patent Numbers 8,861,512 entitled “Method of Enabling a Wireless Device to Make a Network Connection Without Using a Network Operator’s Home Location Register” (“the ‘512 Patent”), 9,173,154 entitled “Method of Enabling a Wireless Device to Make a Network Connection WIthout using a Network Operator’s Home Location Register” (“the ‘154 Patent”), 9,369,575 entitled “Dynamic VOIP Location System” (“the ‘575 Patent”), and 9,591,551 entitled “Method of Enabling a Wireless Device to Make a Network Connection Without Using a Network Operator’s Home Location Register” (“the ‘551 Patent”) owned by Coretek (collectively the “Patents-in-Suit”).

Plaintiff alleged that “Defendant has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe at least one claim of the ‘512 Patent, the ‘154 Patent, the ‘575 Patent, and the ‘551 Patent by using, at least through internal testing or otherwise, the Accused Product without authority in the United States, and will continue to do so unless enjoined by this Court. As a direct and proximate result of Defendant’s direct infringement of the ‘512 Patent, the ‘154 Patent, the ‘575 Patent, and the ‘551 Patent, Plaintiff has been and continues to be damaged”.

Plaintiff further alleged that “Defendant has induced others to infringe the ‘512 Patent, the ‘154 Patent, the ‘575 Patent, and the ‘551 Patent by encouraging infringement, knowing that the acts Defendant induced constituted patent infringement, and its encouraging acts actually resulted in direct patent infringement” and that “Defendant has committed these acts of infringement without license or authorization.”



Four claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff are for the alleged infringement of one or more claims of the ‘512 Patent, ‘154 Patent, the ‘575 Patent and ‘508 Patent respectively.

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order that Defendant has infringed the ‘512 Patent, the ‘154 Patent, the ‘575 Patent, and the ‘551 Patent either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, order an accounting of all infringing sales and damages, that Defendant be permanently restrained and enjoined from directly infringing the ‘512 Patent, the ‘154 Patent, the ‘575 Patent, and the ‘551 Patent. Plaintiff further requested the court to award Plaintiff damages pursuant to 35 U.S.C. §284, order an assessment of pre-judgment and post-judgment interest and costs against Defendant, together with an award of such interest and costs, in accordance with 35 U.S.C. §284 along with costs of action. 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00304

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

Referral Judge

Christopher J. Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coretek Licensing LLC

Defendant

Discord Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Mark Moshos

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

26 #1

Stipulation of Dismissal

26 #26

Main Document

#25

(#25) SO ORDERED re #24 Stipulation of Dismissal. ***Civil Case Terminated*** Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/20/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#24

(#24) Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#23

(#23) REPLY BRIEF re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Joinder in Free Conferencing Corporation's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Discord Inc.. (Moshos, Andrew) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

22 #2

Text of Proposed Order

22 #1

Exhibit

22 #22

Main Document

#21

(#21) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION for Joinder in Free Conferencing Corporation's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Discord Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Moshos, Andrew) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

30 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,861,512; US 9,173,154; US 9,369,575; US 9,591,551. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of Dismissal)(asw) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) SO ORDERED re #24 Stipulation of Dismissal. ***Civil Case Terminated*** Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/20/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY BRIEF re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Joinder in Free Conferencing Corporation's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Discord Inc.. (Moshos, Andrew) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Joinder in Free Conferencing Corporation's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Coretek Licensing LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION for Joinder in Free Conferencing Corporation's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Discord Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Moshos, Andrew) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docket(#20) ORAL ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the parties' June 1, 2021 letter, ADOPTS the parties' proposed schedule set out therein. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/2/2021. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01597-MN-CJB, 1:21-cv-00304-MN-CJB(dlb) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED D.I. #19 Stipulation to stay the filing of the Checklist and Proposed Scheduling Order for a period of fourteen (14) days following the Courts ruling on the Defendants renewed Motion to Dismiss filed by Discord Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/2/2021. (dlb) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Stay the Filing of the Case Management Checklist and Proposed Scheduling Order by Discord Inc.. (Moshos, Andrew) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joint Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Jimmy Chong regarding Regarding May 27, 2021 Order - re 17 Oral Order,,,,,,. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Discord Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 26, 2021 - filed by Discord Inc.. (Moshos, Andrew) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coretek Licensing LLC. Discord Inc. served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketREMARK: The parties should be aware that the Court encourages the participation of newer attorneys in courtroom proceedings and at oral argument. Please see the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtroom Opportunities for Newer Attorneys, a link to which is provided here for the parties' convenience:#http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrder2017.pdf Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00304-MN-CJB, 1:21-cv-00309-MN-CJB(dlb) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#6) ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pre-trial matters up to and including expert discovery matters (but not including summary judgment motions, Daubert motions, pre-trial motions in limine or the pre-trial conference), subject to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and any further Order of the Court. All subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 21-304-MN-CJB. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/4/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00304-MN, 1:21-cv-00309-MN (rjb) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (myr) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,861,512 ;US 9,173,154 ;US 9,369,575 ;US 9,591,551. (myr) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT filed with Jury Demand against Discord Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3550497.) - filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Coretek Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Discord, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Mark Moshos