This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2022 at 07:21:37 (UTC).

Coretek Licensing LLC v. Babylon, LLC

Case Summary

On October 20, 2022, Coretek Licensing LLC (“Coretek” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Andrew S. Curfman of Sand, Sebolt & Wernow Co., LPA, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Babylon, LLC (“Defendant”), seeking declaratory and injunctive relief with damages for alleged patent infringement. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas, with Judge Lee Yeakel presiding.

The plaintiff filed this action for the alleged infringement of U.S. patent Nos. 8,861,512 (“the ‘512 Patent”), 9,173,154 (“the ‘154 Patent”), 9,369,575 (“the ‘575 Patent”), and 9,591,551 (“the ‘551 Patent”) (collectively, the “Patents-in-Suit”).

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged, “Defendant commercializes, inter alia, methods that perform all the steps recited in at least one claim of the ‘512 Patent. More particularly, Defendant commercializes, inter alia, methods, systems, and/or servers that perform all the steps recited in Claims 1, 4, 5, 8, 12, 23, and/or 24 of the ‘512 Patent. Specifically, Defendant makes, uses, sells, offers for sale, or imports a method, system, and/or server that enables a wireless device to initiate a network connection without using a network operator's home location register that encompasses that which is covered by Claims 1, 4, 5, 8, 12, 23, and/or 24 of the ‘512 Patent.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “Defendant commercializes, inter alia, methods, systems, servers, and/or computer products that perform all the steps recited in at least one claim of the ‘154 Patent. More particularly, Defendant commercializes, inter alia, methods that perform all the steps recited in Claims 1, 3, 4, 7, 11, 22, 23, and/or 24 of the ‘154 Patent. Specifically, Defendant makes, uses, sells, offers for sale, or imports a method, system, server, and/or computer product that enables a wireless device to initiate a network connection without using a network operator's home location register that encompasses that which is covered by Claims 1, 3, 4, 7, 11, 22, 23, and/or 24 of the ‘154 Patent.”

The plaintiff further alleged, “Defendant commercializes, inter alia, systems that perform all the steps recited in at least one claim of the ‘575 Patent. More particularly, Defendant commercializes, inter alia, methods that perform all the steps recited in Claim 1 of the ‘575 Patent. Specifically, Defendant makes, uses, sells, offers for sale, or imports a system that detects or determines any given VoIP (Voice over internet protocol) location of any VoIP enabled wireless device registered to the system that encompasses that which is covered by Claim 1 of the ‘575 Patent.”

The plaintiff also alleged, “Defendant commercializes, inter alia, methods, systems, servers, and/or computer products that perform all the steps recited in at least one claim of the ‘551 Patent. More particularly, Defendant commercializes, inter alia, methods that perform all the steps recited in Claims 1, 3, 4, 5, 7, 9, 11, 12, 13, 14, 22, 23, and/or 24 of the ‘551 Patent. Specifically, Defendant makes, uses, sells, offers for sale, or imports a method, system, server, and/or computer product that enables a wireless device to initiate a network connection without using a network operator's home location register that encompasses that which is covered by Claims 1, 3, 4, 5, 7, 9, 11, 12, 13, 14, 22, 23, and/or 24 of the ‘551 Patent.”

Plaintiff additionally alleged, “Defendant has committed these acts of infringement without license or authorization.”

Plaintiff presented four claims for relief from alleged infringement of the patents-in-suit. 

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested declaratory and injunctive relief along with an award of damages, including compensatory and enhanced damages with pre- and post-judgment interest.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01070

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coretek Licensing LLC

Defendant

Babylon, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew S. Curfman

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-US8861512

1 #2

Exhibit B-US9173154

1 #3

Exhibit C-US9369575

1 #4

Exhibit D-US9591551

1 #5

Exhibit E-'512 Claim Chart

1 #6

Exhibit F-'154 Claim Chart

1 #7

Exhibit G-'575 Claim Chart

1 #8

Exhibit H-'551 Claim Chart

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Babylon, LLC. (cc3) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#6

(#6) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cc3) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coretek Licensing LLC. Babylon, LLC served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coretek Licensing LLC. Babylon, LLC served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cc3) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Babylon, LLC. (cc3) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Coretek Licensing LLC. (cc3) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cc3) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cc3) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16659477), filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8861512, #2 Exhibit B-US9173154, #3 Exhibit C-US9369575, #4 Exhibit D-US9591551, #5 Exhibit E-'512 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F-'154 Claim Chart, #7 Exhibit G-'575 Claim Chart, #8 Exhibit H-'551 Claim Chart, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less