This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/26/2020 at 10:40:40 (UTC).

Coretek Licensing LLC v. Avaya, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Coretek Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Avaya, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John R. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01666

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coretek Licensing LLC

Defendant

Avaya, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew S. Curfman

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt & Wernow

1100 Aegis Tower, 4940 Munson Street, Nw

Canton, OH 44718

 

Court Documents

9 #5

ECF Policies and Procedures

9 #4

Budget

9 #3

Magistrate Consent Form

9 #2

Local Rule 30.1

9 #1

Report of Parties' Planning Meeting

#9

#8

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#4

#3

#2

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F-'154 Claim Chart

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 11/4/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge John R. Adams. Judge John R. Adams on 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Local Rule 30.1, #3 Magistrate Consent Form, #4 Budget, #5 ECF Policies and Procedures)(L,J) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Marginal Entry Order approving the parties' #7 stipulation for an extension of time to answer. Answer due 9/30/2020. All future extensions shall be sought by motion practice. Judge John R. Adams on 9/21/2020. (L,J) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Avaya, Inc. on 8/10/2020, filed on behalf of Coretek Licensing LLC Related document(s) #4 . (P,G) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Avaya, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7020 0090 0001 4429 0974. (M,TL) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Original Summons issued for service upon Avaya, Inc. (M,TL) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketThis action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (M,TL) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Original Summons (unsigned) and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Avaya, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketJudge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint for Infringement of Patent with jury demand against Avaya, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10136121, filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8861512, #2 Exhibit B-US9173154, #3 Exhibit C-US9369575, #4 Exhibit D-US9591551, #5 Exhibit E-'512 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F-'154 Claim Chart, #7 Exhibit G-'575 Claim Chart, #8 Exhibit H-'551 Claim Chart, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons) (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less