This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2023 at 09:21:23 (UTC).

Coretek Licensing LLC v. AbleTo, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Coretek Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AbleTo, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-10111

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coretek Licensing LLC

Defendant

AbleTo, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew S. Curfman

Defendant Attorney

Annie Huang

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Andrew S. Curfman dated 01/20/2023. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

7 #3

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

7 #2

Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing

7 #1

Exhibit Declaration

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#5

(#5) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AbleTo, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Andrew S. Curfman re: that this action be filed as related to 1:22-cv-08109. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

1 #8

Exhibit H-'551 Claim Chart

1 #6

Exhibit F-'154 Claim Chart

1 #5

Exhibit E-'512 Claim Chart

1 #4

Exhibit D-US9591551

1 #3

Exhibit C-US9369575

1 #2

Exhibit B-US9173154

1 #1

Exhibit A-US8861512

1 #1

Main Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Andrew S. Curfman dated 01/20/2023. APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. AbleTo, Inc. answer due 2/22/2023 (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/20/2023) (jca) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Andrew S. Curfman dated 01/20/2023. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, . #1 Complaint,. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is therefore, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is January 23, 2023. (AbleTo, Inc. answer due 1/23/2023.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/19/22) (yv) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, . Document filed by AbleTo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Huang, Annie) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-06424-JGK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. AbleTo, Inc. served on 12/1/2022, answer due 12/22/2022. Service was accepted by Vincenza Cipriano, authorized to accept on behalf of Registered Agent. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AbleTo, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Andrew S. Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27013466. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sac) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Andrew S. Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27013466. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AbleTo, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Andrew S. Curfman re: that this action be filed as related to 1:22-cv-08109. Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AbleTo, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27013321)Document filed by Coretek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8861512, #2 Exhibit B-US9173154, #3 Exhibit C-US9369575, #4 Exhibit D-US9591551, #5 Exhibit E-'512 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F-'154 Claim Chart, #7 Exhibit G-'575 Claim Chart, #8 Exhibit H-'551 Claim Chart).(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less