This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2021 at 07:05:25 (UTC).

Core Optical Technologies, LLC v. Juniper Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Core Optical Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Juniper Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sallie Kim and Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02428

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sallie Kim

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Core Optical Technologies, LLC

Defendant

Juniper Networks Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lawrence Robert LaPorte

Attorney at Lewsi, Brisbois, Bisgaard &Smith LLP

633 W. 5Th Street, #4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Lawrence M. Hadley

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd., 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Stephen Underwood

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen and Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Todd M. Briggs

Attorney at Pro Hac Vice

Ray R. Zado

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Dr., 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Kevin P. B. Johnson

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Todd Michael Briggs

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, Fifth Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

 

Court Documents

84 #41

41

84 #40

40

84 #39

39

84 #38

38

84 #37

37

84 #3

3

84 #2

2

84 #1

Exhibit 1

#84

1 #18

Exhibit 18

1 #17

Exhibit 17

1 #16

Exhibit 16

1 #15

Exhibit 15

1 #14

Exhibit 14

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

421 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) AMENDED COMPLAINT - THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byCore Optical Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7, #8 8, #9 9, #10 10, #11 11, #12 12, #13 13, #14 14, #15 15, #16 16, #17 17, #18 18, #19 19, #20 20, #21 21, #22 22, #23 23, #24 24, #25 25, #26 26, #27 27, #28 28, #29 29, #30 30, #31 31, #32 32, #33 33, #34 34, #35 35, #36 36, #37 37, #38 38, #39 39, #40 40, #41 41, #42 42)(Hadley, Lawrence) (Filed on 5/28/2021) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #73 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint; denying #77 Motion to Dismiss; denying #78 Motion to Stay. Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - To be determined.(vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #78 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss ) to Juniper's Re-Noticed Motion to Stay Discovery filed byCore Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Filed on 5/27/2021) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #77 MOTION to Dismiss ) to Juniper's Re-Noticed Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byCore Optical Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hadley, Lawrence) (Filed on 5/27/2021) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply in support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply in support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #5 Declaration in support of Reply in support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit I, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit J, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit K, #17 Redacted Version of Exhibit J, #18 Redacted Version of Exhibit K, #19 Exhibit L)(Hadley, Lawrence) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #73 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ) Juniper's Opp to Core's MTA TAC filed byJuniper Networks Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl of NH, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6)(Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 5/12/2021) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss filed by Juniper Networks Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Telephonic Only before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/24/2021. Replies due by 6/1/2021. (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 5/10/2021) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Juniper Networks Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/24/2021. Replies due by 6/1/2021. (Briggs, Todd) (Filed on 5/10/2021) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) CLERK'S NOTICE terminating the Motion for Leave file at docket number #75 . Counsel only needed to re-notice the motion for hearing, not file an entirely new motion. The hearing date of 6/10/2021, will remain on calendar for the hearing on the Motion at docket number #73 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) MOTION for Leave to File (re-notice) filed by Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Underwood in support of Motion for Leave, #2 Exhibit A, #3 B, #4 C, #5 D, #6 E, #7 F, #8 G, #9 H, #10 I, #11 J, #12 K, #13 L, #14 M, #15 N, #16 O, #17 P, #18 Q, #19 R, #20 S, #21 T, #22 U, #23 V, #24 W, #25 X, #26 Y, #27 Z, #28 AA, #29 AB, #30 AC, #31 AD, #32 AE, #33 AF, #34 AG, #35 AH, #36 AI, #37 AJ, #38 AK, #39 AL, #40 AM, #41 AN, #42 AO, #43 AP, #44 AQ, #45 AR, #46 AS, #47 AT, #48 AU)(Hadley, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (knmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Juniper Networks, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. Related Case(s): 12-cv-1872; 16-cv-0437; 17-cv-0548 (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC, identifying Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24764016 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18) (Attorney Lawrence M Hadley added to party Core Optical Technologies, LLC(pty:pla))(Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Juniper Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Core Optical Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd M. Briggs

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ray R Zado