This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/06/2020 at 08:21:31 (UTC).

Core Optical Technologies, LLC v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 Core Optical Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cisco Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna, John D. Early, John A. Kronstadt and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01468

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

James V. Selna

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judges

John D. Early

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Core Optical Technologies, LLC

Defendants

Cisco Systems, Inc.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lawrence M Hadley

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Jacobs Howard Avchen and Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Lawrence Robert LaPorte

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Stephen Eric Underwood

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen and Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

David Paul Enzminger

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

275 Middlefield Road Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Krishnan Padmanabhan

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

#17

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #1

Exhibit 1-15

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Enzminger, David) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Krishnan Padmanabhan on behalf of Defendant Cisco Systems, Inc. (Padmanabhan, Krishnan) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE JOINT REPORT FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (DKT. #15 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Pursuant to the order setting the scheduling conference in this matter (Dkt. #15 ), the Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report (the "Joint Report") shall be filed on or before October 9, 2020. To serve judicial and party efficiency and to expedite review, counsel in this action are ordered to confer with the parties in the following related actions: 8:19-cv-2189-JAK-RAO (Juniper); 8:19-cv-2189-JAK-RAO (Nokia); and 8:20-cv-1463-JAK-RAO (ADVA) in preparing the Joint Report. An identical Joint Report shall be filed in each action no later than October 9, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eth) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/9/2020. (vv) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cisco Systems, Inc. answer now due 9/30/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Cisco Systems, Inc..(Attorney David Paul Enzminger added to party Cisco Systems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Enzminger, David) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (droj) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-02189 JAK(RAOx). Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-01468 JAK(RAOx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC, upon Defendant Cisco Systems, Inc. served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cisco Systems Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge James V. Selna. Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:20-cv-01468 CJC (JDEx). (esa) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cisco Systems, Inc. (et) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC, (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. NOTICE OF RELATED CASES UNDER LOCAL RULE 83-1.3 Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-02190-JAK-RAO; 8:19-cv-2189-JAK-RAO (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27543199 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15) (Attorney Lawrence M Hadley added to party Core Optical Technologies, LLC(pty:pla))(Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Core Optical Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cisco Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krishnan Padmanabhan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David P. Enzminger