This case was last updated from PACER on 06/26/2021 at 09:31:29 (UTC).

Core Optical Technologies, LLC v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 Core Optical Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Charter Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rozella A. Oliver and Mark C. Scarsi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00789

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Core Optical Technologies, LLC

Defendants

Does 1-10

AT and T, Inc.

Microsoft Corporation

Comcast Corporation

Charter Communications, Inc.

Verizon Communications, Inc.

Google, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lawrence M. Hadley

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen and Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Stephen Underwood

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen and Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#34

#33

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#9

#8

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lc) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER GRANTING STAY OF PROCEEDINGS #32 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: 1. All proceedings between Core and the Defendants, except proceedings pursuant to Rule 45 in the Cisco case, are hereby STAYED; 2. The Parties shall meet and confer, and jointly report to the Court regarding continuation of the stay and the requested duration of the stay, on or before the earlier of: (i) May 31, 2022; (ii) two weeks before the final pre-trial conference in the Cisco case; or (iii) one week after dismissal of the Cisco case; 3. This stay shall remain in effect until dissolved by order of the Court; and 4. For recordkeeping purposes, the Court directs the Clerk to remove the case from the Courts active caseload until further application by the parties or order of this Court. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) STIPULATION to Stay Case pending the final pre-trial conference in the underlying Cisco case filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS (G-112a) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: In accordance with the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically Filed Documents (ECF No. #30 ), regarding Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (ECF Nos. [24, #25 , #26 , #27 , #28 , and #29 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents are accepted as filed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #24 , #25 , #26 , #27 , #28 , #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Filer selected incorrect statute prompt as "SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D)" which resulted in misinformation as having served Clerk of the Court as agent for defendant, thus missing the name of the private agent served.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC, upon Defendant AT and T, Inc. served on 5/7/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC, upon Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. served on 5/7/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC, upon Defendant Comcast Corporation served on 5/10/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC, upon Defendant Google, LLC served on 5/7/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC, upon Defendant Microsoft Corporation served on 5/7/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #6 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons to AT&T, #2 Summons to Charter, #3 Summons to Comcast, #4 Summons to Google, #5 Summons to Microsoft, #6 Summons to Verizon)(Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. Related Case(s): 20-cv-1468, 20-cv-1463, 8:19-cv-02190, 8:21-cv-00046, 8:21-cv-00049 (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC, (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31192181 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25) (Attorney Lawrence M. Hadley added to party Core Optical Technologies, LLC(pty:pla))(Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Core Optical Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COMCAST CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Charter Communications Inc. is a litigant