This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2021 at 09:54:59 (UTC).

Core Optical Technologies, LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 Core Optical Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Autumn D. Spaeth, Cormac J. Carney, John A. Kronstadt and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00049

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Autumn D. Spaeth

Rozella A. Oliver

Presiding Judges

Cormac J. Carney

John A. Kronstadt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Core Optical Technologies, LLC

Defendants

Does 1-10

Amazon.com, Inc.

CenturyLink, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lawrence M Hadley

Attorney at Glaser Weill Fink Howard Avchen and Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Stephen Underwood

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen and Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Todd Richard Gregorian

Attorney at Fenwick and West LLP

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041

Eric B Young

Attorney at Fenwick and West LLP

555 California Street 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

J David Hadden

Attorney at Fenwick and West LLP

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041-2008

Saina S Shamilov

Attorney at Fenwick and West

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit 4

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com, Inc. answer now due 3/15/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc..(Hadden, J) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric B Young on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. (Attorney Eric B Young added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Young, Eric) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Todd Richard Gregorian on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. (Attorney Todd Richard Gregorian added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gregorian, Todd) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Saina S Shamilov on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. (Attorney Saina S Shamilov added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Shamilov, Saina) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney J David Hadden on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. (Hadden, J) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc., (Attorney J David Hadden added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hadden, J) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC, upon Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant CenturyLink, Inc. (jp) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #7 , Summons Request #6 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. Related Case(s): 20-cv-1463-JAK-RAO; 8:19-cv-02190-JAK-RAO;8:19-cv-2189-JAK-RAO; 20-cv-1468-JAK-RAO (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC, (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29974324 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Attorney Lawrence M Hadley added to party Core Optical Technologies, LLC(pty:pla))(Hadley, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Core Optical Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURYLINK is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. David Hadden Esq.