This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2020 at 09:09:10 (UTC).

Core Communications, Inc. v. Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 Core Communications, Inc filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. Jones, III and Jennifer P. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01802

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John E. Jones, III

Jennifer P. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Core Communications, Inc.

Defendants

Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission

Verizon North LLC

Verizon Pennsylvania LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark D. Bradshaw

Attorney at Stevens & Lee, P.C.

17 North Second Street, 16Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Defendant Attorneys

Rhonda L. Daviston

Attorney at Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission

400 North Street

Harrisburg, PA 17120

David Screven

Attorney at Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission

P.O. Box 3265

Harrisburg, PA 17105-3265

Christian A McDewell

Attorney at PA Public Utility Commission

P.O. Box 3265

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Lois A. Burns

Attorney at Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission

400 North Street

Harrisburg, PA 17120-0211

Brian T. Feeney

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1717 Arch St., Suite 400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Scott H. Angstreich

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Lois A. Burns on behalf of Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission (Burns, Lois) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#15

(#15) Order approving re #13 Stipulation. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/16/2020. (ve) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#14

(#14) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Scott H. Angstreich, Esquire. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/16/2020. (ve) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION by Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission. (McDewell, Christian) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#12

(#12) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Brian T. Feeney on behalf of Verizon North LLC, Verizon Pennsylvania LLC Attorney Scott H. Angstreich is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5339583.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Feeney, Brian) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Feeney on behalf of Verizon North LLC, Verizon Pennsylvania LLC (Feeney, Brian) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1) The PUCs motion to compel joinder and for a more definite statement under Rule 12(e), Doc. 6, is DENIED as moot and without prejudice. 2) Defendants shall respond to the amended complaint, Doc. 7, in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/5/2020 (ve) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#9

(#9) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson. (ve) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

8 #1

Summons Packet

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Verizon North LLC, Verizon Pennsylvania LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

7 #3

Exhibit(s) C

7 #2

Exhibit(s) B

7 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission, filed by Core Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Bradshaw, Mark) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Compel Joinder, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission.(McDewell, Christian) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by David Screven on behalf of Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission (Screven, David) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Christian A McDewell on behalf of Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission (McDewell, Christian) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for Lois Burns can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Lois A. Burns on behalf of Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission (Burns, Lois) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Order approving re #13 Stipulation. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/16/2020. (ve) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Scott H. Angstreich, Esquire. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/16/2020. (ve) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION by Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission. (McDewell, Christian) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Scott H. Angstreich and associate counsel bar status verified. (mw) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Brian T. Feeney on behalf of Verizon North LLC, Verizon Pennsylvania LLC Attorney Scott H. Angstreich is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5339583.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Feeney, Brian) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Feeney on behalf of Verizon North LLC, Verizon Pennsylvania LLC (Feeney, Brian) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1) The PUCs motion to compel joinder and for a more definite statement under Rule 12(e), Doc. 6, is DENIED as moot and without prejudice. 2) Defendants shall respond to the amended complaint, Doc. 7, in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/5/2020 (ve) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson. (ve) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Verizon North LLC, Verizon Pennsylvania LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission, filed by Core Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Bradshaw, Mark) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Compel Joinder, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission.(McDewell, Christian) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by David Screven on behalf of Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission (Screven, David) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Christian A McDewell on behalf of Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission (McDewell, Christian) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda L. Daviston on behalf of All Defendants. (Daviston, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketVERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING Case reassigned to Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson for all further proceedings. (jw) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5280833), filed by Core Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment)(pjr) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Verizon North, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARK D. BRADSHAW