This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2019 at 07:55:21 (UTC).

Cordle v. C. R. Bard, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability case was filed by Cordle against C R Bard, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00396

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

Presiding Judge

John M. Gerrard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donna Cordle

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

C. R. Bard, Inc.

Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott R Seideman

Attorney at Seideman Law Firm PC

701 Commerce St., Ste. 400

Dallas, TX 75202

Scott R. Seideman

Attorney at SEIDEMAN LAW FIRM

200 Adriatic Parkway, Suite 102

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at NELSON, MULLINS LAW FIRM - GEORGIA

201 17Th Street, N.W., Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Thomas E. Dutton

Attorney at GREENBERG, TRAURIG LAW FIRM - CHICAGO

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

Tyler Coombe

Attorney at GREENBERG, TRAURIG LAW FIRM - COLORADO

1144 15Th Street, Suite 3300

Denver, CO 80202

Harrison Meyers

Attorney at GREENBERG, TRAURIG LAW FIRM - COLORADO

1144 15Th Street, Suite 3300

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16910012 filed by Donna Cordle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#3

(#4) NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.] (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.] (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03077. Original electronic file received. (Entered: 09/09/2019)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Scott R Seideman has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Richard B. North has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#9

(#9) MASTER COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS. (LAC) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

23 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#23

(#23) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend the Deadline to File the Rule 26(f) Report by Attorney Scott R. Seideman on behalf of Plaintiff Donna Cordle. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seideman, Scott) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#22

(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/4/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Scott R. Seideman on behalf of Plaintiff Donna Cordle (Seideman, Scott) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Harrison Meyers on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Meyers, Harrison) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Tyler Coombe on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Coombe, Tyler) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#18

(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Thomas E. Dutton on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc..(Dutton, Thomas) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#16

RESTRICTED

#14

(#15) ORDER - that the motion to withdraw Richard North, Jr. as counsel of record for Defendants, (Filing No. #14 ), is granted. Richard North, Jr. shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend the Rule 26(f) Report Deadline.(Filing No. #23 ). The parties shall file their joint 26(f) report on or before November 25, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ALW) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend the Deadline to File the Rule 26(f) Report by Attorney Scott R. Seideman on behalf of Plaintiff Donna Cordle. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seideman, Scott) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/4/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Scott R. Seideman on behalf of Plaintiff Donna Cordle (Seideman, Scott) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Harrison Meyers on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Meyers, Harrison) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Tyler Coombe on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Coombe, Tyler) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Thomas E. Dutton on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc..(Dutton, Thomas) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) TEXT ORDER A telephone conference is set for October 4, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. before the undersigned magistrate judge. The parties shall use the case conference instructions assigned to this case to participate in the call. (See Filing No. #16 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ALW) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER - that the motion to withdraw Richard North, Jr. as counsel of record for Defendants, (Filing No. #14 ), is granted. Richard North, Jr. shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MASTER COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS. (LAC) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Richard B. North has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Scott R Seideman has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • (#6) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LAC) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03077. Original electronic file received. (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Remark: Case transferred to District of Nebraska via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.] (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.] (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.] (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • (#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-3077-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16910012 filed by Donna Cordle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.] (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.