This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:58:40 (UTC).

Cordell v. Reherman

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Cordell filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Reherman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David A. Faber. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00010

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David A. Faber

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kamalah Cordell

Alderson, WV 24910

Defendant

M. E. Reherman

Respondents

USA

Warden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Matthew C. Lindsay

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

P. O. Box 1713

Charleston, WV 25326-1713

Vickie LeDuc

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Suite 400, 36 South Charles Street

Baltimore, MD 21201

Matthew A. Haven

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Suite 400, 36 South Charles Street

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#10

(#10) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to substitute the Warden of Alderson Prison Camp as the respondent herein. Respondent shall answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) within 60 days of the entry of this Order showing cause, if any, why the relief should not be granted. Petitioner may file a Reply to the Answer within 60 days after service of same by the Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/9/2020. (cc: Petitioner; USA w/2241 Petition) (arb)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by USA.(Haven, Matthew) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/6/2020.]

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)

#15

(#15) MOTION by Kamalah Cordell to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (arb)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#13

(#13) ORDER re: Respondent's #11 Response to Order to Show Cause: Petitioner shall have 60 days after service of this Order in which to file a reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/23/2020. (cc: Petitioner and counsel of record) (arb)

#8

(#8) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Maryland; Case Number 1:19-cv-03076. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

#12

(#12) LETTER-FORM MOTION by Kamalah Cordell for Appointment of Counsel. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (arb)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE by Warden to the Court's #10 Order. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lindsay, Matthew)

#16

(#16) PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Clerk is directed to substitute M. E. Reherman, Warden, Alderson Federal Prison Camp as the Respondent in this case. It is RECOMMENDED that the presiding District Judge GRANT Petitioner's #15 MOTION to Dismiss; DISMISS Petitioner's #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), without prejudice, and remove this case from the docket of the Court. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. If the PF&R was served electronically, Objections are due by 3/19/2020. If the PF&R was served by mail, Objections are due by 3/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/5/2020. (cc: Petitioner and counsel of record) (arb)

#6

(#6) MARGINAL ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/3/2020. (c/m 1/3/20 cags, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/6/2020.]

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kamalah Cordell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/24/2019)

5 #1

Memorandum in Support

1 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) MARGINAL ORDER granting #5 Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/3/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/6/2020.]

#5

(#5) MOTION to Transfer Case by USA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(LeDuc, Vickie) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/6/2020.]

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: denying Petitioner's #12 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/28/2020. (cc: Petitioner; counsel of record) (mk)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Clerk is directed to substitute M. E. Reherman, Warden, Alderson Federal Prison Camp as the Respondent in this case. It is RECOMMENDED that the presiding District Judge GRANT Petitioner's #15 MOTION to Dismiss; DISMISS Petitioner's #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), without prejudice, and remove this case from the docket of the Court. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. If the PF&R was served electronically, Objections are due by 3/19/2020. If the PF&R was served by mail, Objections are due by 3/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/5/2020. (cc: Petitioner and counsel of record) (arb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION by Kamalah Cordell to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (arb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: denying Petitioner's #12 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/28/2020. (cc: Petitioner; counsel of record) (mk)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER re: Respondent's #11 Response to Order to Show Cause: Petitioner shall have 60 days after service of this Order in which to file a reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/23/2020. (cc: Petitioner and counsel of record) (arb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) LETTER-FORM MOTION by Kamalah Cordell for Appointment of Counsel. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (arb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE by Warden to the Court's #10 Order. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lindsay, Matthew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to substitute the Warden of Alderson Prison Camp as the respondent herein. Respondent shall answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) within 60 days of the entry of this Order showing cause, if any, why the relief should not be granted. Petitioner may file a Reply to the Answer within 60 days after service of same by the Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/9/2020. (cc: Petitioner; USA w/2241 Petition) (arb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Maryland; Case Number 1:19-cv-03076. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MARGINAL ORDER granting #5 Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/3/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/6/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MARGINAL ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/3/2020. (c/m 1/3/20 cags, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/6/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Transfer Case by USA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(LeDuc, Vickie) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/6/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of USA (LeDuc, Vickie) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/6/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by USA.(Haven, Matthew) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/6/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER Directing Respondent to file a response within 40 days re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kamalah Cordell. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/28/2019. (c/m 10/28/19 bas, Deputy Clerk) . [Transferred from Maryland on 1/6/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kamalah Cordell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.