This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2021 at 09:52:27 (UTC).

Cordelia Lighting, Inc. v. Katerra, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Cordelia Lighting, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Katerra, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01546

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cordelia Lighting, Inc.

Defendants

Katerra, Inc., D.B.A. Dodo Lighting

Katerra, Inc. doing business as Dodo Lighting

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lester J Savit

One Llp, East Tower, 4000 Macarthur Boulevard Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

John E Lord

One Llp, 9301 Wilshire Boulevard Penthouse Suite

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Paul Y Feng

One Llp, East Tower, 4000 Macarthur Boulevard Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorney

Michael J Sacksteder

Attorney at Fenwick and West LLP

555 California Street 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/19/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 7/26/2021 at 9:00 am. (sw) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Katerra, Inc., identifying Softbank Group Corp.. (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Katerra, Inc..(Attorney Michael J Sacksteder added to party Katerra, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cordelia Lighting, Inc., upon Defendant Katerra, Inc. served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jordan S. (refused last name), Intake Specialist at Incorp Services, Inc. registered agent for service of process for Katerra, Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Savit, Lester) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Katerra, Inc. (car) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Cordelia Lighting, Inc.. (Savit, Lester) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Cordelia Lighting, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Cordelia Lighting, Inc.; and, Defendant Katerra, Inc., D.B.A. Kodo Lighting. (Savit, Lester) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Cordelia Lighting, Inc.. (Savit, Lester) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Cordelia Lighting, Inc.. (Savit, Lester) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30615052 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Cordelia Lighting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Lester J Savit added to party Cordelia Lighting, Inc.(pty:pla))(Savit, Lester) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Katerra Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Sacksteder