This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2022 at 07:38:22 (UTC).

Copple et al v. Arthur J Gallagher & Co et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 Copple filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Arthur J Gallagher Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lauren King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00116

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lauren King

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Matthew Copple

Justin Ward

Jeremy Fischer

Thomas Jay Moriarty

Defendants

Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.

Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Illinois)

Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC

Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc.

City of Bellevue

Does 1-20

Arthur J Gallagher & Co

Arthur J Gallagher & Co (Illinois)

Arthur J Gallagher Service Company LLC

Arthur J Gallagher Risk Management Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick B. Reddy

Attorney at EMERY REDDY

600 Stewart St, Ste 1100

Seattle, WA 98101

Timothy W Emery

Attorney at EMERY REDDY

600 Stewart St, Ste 1100

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

Hathaway Burden

Attorney at SUMMIT LAW GROUP

315 5Th Ave S, Ste 1000

Seattle, WA 98104

J. Chad Mitchell

Attorney at SUMMIT LAW GROUP

315 5Th Ave S, Ste 1000

Seattle, WA 98104

Chad R Barnes

Attorney at BELLEVUE CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

450 110Th Ave Ne, P O Box 90012

Bellevue, WA 98004

Cheryl A Zakrzewski

Attorney at BELLEVUE CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

450 110Th Ave Ne, P O Box 90012

Bellevue, WA 98009-9012

Denise L Ashbaugh

Attorney at ARETE LAW GROUP PLLC

1218 Third Ave Ste 2100

Seattle, WA 98101

Jonah O. Harrison

Attorney at ARETE LAW GROUP PLLC

1218 Third Ave Ste 2100

Seattle, WA 98101

Andrew E Nieland

Attorney at KING & SPALDING (CHICAGO)

110 N Wacker Dr Ste 3800

Chicago, IL 60606

Molly A Terwilliger

Attorney at STOKES LAWRENCE PS (SEATTLE)

1420 Fifth Avenue, Ste 3000

Seattle, WA 98101-2393

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) DECLARATION of Andrew Nieland filed by Defendant Arthur J Gallagher & Co re #38 MOTION for Extension of Time for Deadlines (Terwilliger, Molly) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

38 #1

Proposed Order

38 #38

Main Document

#37

(#37) Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline to Answer, filed by Defendant Arthur J Gallagher & Co. Noting Date 3/30/2022, (Terwilliger, Molly) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#36

(#36) DECLARATION of Andrew Nieland filed by Defendant Arthur J Gallagher & Co re #21 MOTION to Transfer Case (Terwilliger, Molly) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#35

(#35) REPLY, filed by Defendant Arthur J Gallagher & Co, TO RESPONSE to #21 MOTION to Transfer Case (Terwilliger, Molly) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#34

(#34) REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Matthew Copple, TO RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Remand (Emery, Timothy) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

21 #1

Proposed Order

21 #21

Main Document

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Arthur J. Gallagher & Co, AJG Financial Services LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher Brokerage & Risk Management Lervices LLC for Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Illinois), Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc., Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Illinois), Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc., Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Mitchell, J.) Modified on 2/7/2022 to add additional corporate parents/affiliates named in disclosure statement (KB). (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Filing re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Illinois), Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc., Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Mitchell, J.) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Matthew Copple (Reddy, Patrick) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#2

(#6) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s); Notice of Pendency of Other Action.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ST) Modified on 2/7/2022 to strike deficiency re Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney (see docket #2 ) (KB). (Entered: 02/03/2022)

1 #4

Declaration of Chad Mitchell

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #1

Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) DECLARATION of Andrew Nieland filed by Defendant Arthur J Gallagher & Co re #38 MOTION for Extension of Time for Deadlines (Terwilliger, Molly) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION for Extension of Time for Deadlines, filed by Defendant Arthur J Gallagher & Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/8/2022, (Terwilliger, Molly) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline to Answer, filed by Defendant Arthur J Gallagher & Co. Noting Date 3/30/2022, (Terwilliger, Molly) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) DECLARATION of Andrew Nieland filed by Defendant Arthur J Gallagher & Co re #21 MOTION to Transfer Case (Terwilliger, Molly) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) REPLY, filed by Defendant Arthur J Gallagher & Co, TO RESPONSE to #21 MOTION to Transfer Case (Terwilliger, Molly) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Matthew Copple, TO RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Remand (Emery, Timothy) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER re #25 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew E Nieland for Defendants Arthur J Gallagher & Co, Arthur J Gallagher & Co (Illinois), Arthur J Gallagher Risk Management Services Inc, and Arthur J Gallagher Service Company LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) DECLARATION of Jonah O. Harrison filed by Defendant City of Bellevue re #21 MOTION to Transfer Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Harrison, Jonah) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) RESPONSE, by Defendant City of Bellevue, to #21 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harrison, Jonah) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) DECLARATION of Jonah O. Harrison filed by Defendant City of Bellevue re #20 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Harrison, Jonah) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted federal court jury demand on file. (ST) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s); Notice of Pendency of Other Action.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ST) Modified on 2/7/2022 to strike deficiency re Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney (see docket #2 ) (KB). (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketJudge Lauren King added. (ST) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Hathaway Burden for Arthur J Gallagher & Co, Arthur J Gallagher & Co (Illinois), Arthur J Gallagher Risk Management Services Inc, and Arthur J Gallagher Service Company LLC added; per #2 Notice of Appearance. (KB) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Arthur J. Gallagher & Co, AJG Financial Services LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher Brokerage & Risk Management Lervices LLC for Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Illinois), Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc., Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Illinois), Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc., Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Mitchell, J.) Modified on 2/7/2022 to add additional corporate parents/affiliates named in disclosure statement (KB). (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Illinois), Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc., Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Mitchell, J.) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Matthew Copple (Reddy, Patrick) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney J. Chad Mitchell on behalf of Defendants Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Illinois), Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc., Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Mitchell, J.) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 22-2-00237-9SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7425035), filed by Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Services, Inc., Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. (Illinois), Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration of Chad Mitchell)(Mitchell, J.) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER RISK MANAGEMENT SER- is a litigant

Latest cases where Arthur J. Gallagher & Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J Chad Mitchell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hathaway Burden