This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2022 at 09:13:08 (UTC).

Copeland v. Weyerhaeuser NR Company

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 Copeland filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Weyerhaeuser NR Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisa G. Wood and Benjamin W. Cheesbro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00025

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Vernon A. Copeland

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Weyerhaeuser NR Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Steven G. Blackerby

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Derek Rajavuori

Pamela Lawrence Ferrell

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Weyerhaeuser NR Company's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to

1 #2

Exhibit B - Summons, Complaint, General Civil Case Filing Information, Sheriff

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/15/2022. (ca) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#3

(#3) Removal NOTICE to all Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set Deadlines: Weyerhaeuser NR Company answer due 3/22/2022. Compliance due by 3/26/2022. Pending Motions due by 3/30/2022. (ca) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Weyerhaeuser NR Company. (Ferrell, Pamela) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Vernon A. Copeland by Weyerhaeuser NR Company.(Ferrell, Pamela) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#6

(#6) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Weyerhaeuser NR Company. (Ferrell, Pamela) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven G. Blackerby on behalf of Vernon A. Copeland (Blackerby, Steven) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#8

(#8) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Vernon A. Copeland, Vernon A. Copeland. (Blackerby, Steven) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rajavuori, Derek) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Counterclaim by Vernon A. Copeland.(Blackerby, Steven) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Disclosures due 5/2/22. Written Discovery due by 8/5/2022. Discovery Depositions of Fact Witnesses due by 8/26/2022. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 9/9/2022. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 10/10/2022. Discovery Status Report due by 10/17/2022. Discovery Status Conference 10/20/2022. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 11/17/2022. Rule 36 Requests for Admission due 12/8/2022. Motions due by 12/19/2022. Depositions of All Witnesses Taken for Use at Trial due by 1/18/2023. Pretrial Order due by 2/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 4/19/2022. (gmh) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/20/2022 03:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy Clerk prior to scheduled call. (KM) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Disclosures due 5/2/22. Written Discovery due by 8/5/2022. Discovery Depositions of Fact Witnesses due by 8/26/2022. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 9/9/2022. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 10/10/2022. Discovery Status Report due by 10/17/2022. Discovery Status Conference 10/20/2022. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 11/17/2022. Rule 36 Requests for Admission due 12/8/2022. Motions due by 12/19/2022. Depositions of All Witnesses Taken for Use at Trial due by 1/18/2023. Pretrial Order due by 2/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 4/19/2022. (gmh) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Counterclaim by Vernon A. Copeland.(Blackerby, Steven) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (thb) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rajavuori, Derek) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Vernon A. Copeland, Vernon A. Copeland. (Blackerby, Steven) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven G. Blackerby on behalf of Vernon A. Copeland (Blackerby, Steven) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Weyerhaeuser NR Company. (Ferrell, Pamela) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Vernon A. Copeland by Weyerhaeuser NR Company.(Ferrell, Pamela) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Weyerhaeuser NR Company. (Ferrell, Pamela) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Removal NOTICE to all Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set Deadlines: Weyerhaeuser NR Company answer due 3/22/2022. Compliance due by 3/26/2022. Pending Motions due by 3/30/2022. (ca) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/15/2022. (ca) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Camden County, State of Georgia, case number SUV2022000101. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGASDC-3306311), filed by Weyerhaeuser NR Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Weyerhaeuser NR Company's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, Complaint, General Civil Case Filing Information, Sheriff's Entry of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less