This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2019 at 10:17:54 (UTC).

Copeland et al v. Post Consumer Brands, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 Copeland filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Post Consumer Brands, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sandra J. Feuerstein and A. Kathleen Tomlinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02488

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sandra J. Feuerstein

Referral Judge

A. Kathleen Tomlinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kenneth Copeland

John Doe

Defendant

Post Consumer Brands, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Spencer I. Sheehan

Attorney at Sheehan & Associates, P.C.

505 Northern Boulevard, Suite 311

Great Neck, NY 11021

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Post Consumer Brands, LLC. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#2

(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Post Consumer Brands, LLC filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11426586, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Kenneth Copeland, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Sheehan, Spencer) Modified on 4/30/2019 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 04/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Federal Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon Defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Post Consumer Brands, LLC. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Post Consumer Brands, LLC filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11426586, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Kenneth Copeland, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Sheehan, Spencer) Modified on 4/30/2019 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POST CONSUMER BRANDS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spencer Sheehan