This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:22:20 (UTC).

COPELAND v. POLICE OFFICER CORY SADLER et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 COPELAND filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against POLICE OFFICER CORY SADLER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael J. Hluchaniuk and Mark A. Goldsmith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13404

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael J. Hluchaniuk

Presiding Judge

Mark A. Goldsmith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DARIUS COPELAND

Defendants

City of Romulus

POLICE OFFICER CORY SADLER

POLICE OFFICER OTTER

POLICE OFFICER MCKINSTRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas E. Kuhn

Attorney at Thomas E. Kuhn, P.C.

645 Griswold, Ste. 1900, Suite 515

Detroit, MI 48226

David A. Robinson

Attorney at Robinson and Associates, P.C.

28145 Greenfield, Suite 100

Southfield, MI 48076

Defendant Attorney

Audrey J. Forbush

Attorney at Plunkett & Cooney

111 E. Court Street, Suite 1B

Flint, MI 48502

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/19/2020, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/6/2020, Final Settlement Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2020 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, Jury Trial set for 12/14/2020 08:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Refer to image for additional dates) (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#9

(#9) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Robinson, David) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith). Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER Regarding Removal #1 . Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Forbush, Audrey) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Robinson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, David) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Robinson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, David) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas E. Kuhn appearing on behalf of DARIUS COPELAND (Kuhn, Thomas) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit EXHIBIT A - COMPLAINT

1 #1

Document Continuation

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from WYANE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT, case number 19-013718-NO. Receipt No: 0645-7491375 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A - COMPLAINT) (Forbush, Audrey) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/19/2020, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/6/2020, Final Settlement Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2020 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, Jury Trial set for 12/14/2020 08:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Refer to image for additional dates) (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/19/2019 (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Robinson, David) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith). Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Regarding Removal #1 . Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Forbush, Audrey) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Robinson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, David) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Robinson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, David) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas E. Kuhn appearing on behalf of DARIUS COPELAND (Kuhn, Thomas) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from WYANE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT, case number 19-013718-NO. Receipt No: 0645-7491375 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A - COMPLAINT) (Forbush, Audrey) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.