This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:32:20 (UTC).

Cope v. State of Nevada et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Cope filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against State of Nevada. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kent J. Dawson and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02094

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kent J. Dawson

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Cope

Las Vegas, NV 89115

Defendants

State of Nevada

Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Dept

L. S. Tracy

City of Las Vegas

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT by Jennifer Cope. (SLD) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall file the #1 -1 Complaint. Defendants the State of Nevada, the City of Las Vegas, and the Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Amended Complaint deadline: 2/4/2020. If an Amended Complaint is filed the Clerk of the Court is directed NOT to issue Summons on the Amended Complaint. The Court will issue a Screening Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (SLD) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #4

*Restricted*

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jennifer Cope. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(SLD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2019: #4 Exhibit C) (SLD). Modified to restrict access to Exhibit C per LR IC 6-1(c) on 12/6/2019 (SLD). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT by Jennifer Cope. (SLD) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall file the #1 -1 Complaint. Defendants the State of Nevada, the City of Las Vegas, and the Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Amended Complaint deadline: 2/4/2020. If an Amended Complaint is filed the Clerk of the Court is directed NOT to issue Summons on the Amended Complaint. The Court will issue a Screening Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (SLD) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jennifer Cope. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(SLD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2019: #4 Exhibit C) (SLD). Modified to restrict access to Exhibit C per LR IC 6-1(c) on 12/6/2019 (SLD). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less