This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2020 at 11:06:29 (UTC).

Cooperativa de Cardiologos de PR et al v. MMM Healthcare, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Cooperativa de Cardiologos de PR filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against MMM Healthcare, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01296

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay A. Garcia-Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cooperativa de Medicos Ortopedas de Puerto Rico

San Juan, PR 00910

Cooperativa de Medicos Gastroenterologos

Cooperativa de Cardiologos de PR

San Juan, PR 00936-7328

Cooperativa de Medicos Oftalmologos de Puerto Rico

San Juan, PR 00908-0001

Cooperativa de Medicos Ortopedas de Puerto Rico doing business as ORTHOCOOP

Po Box 8235

San Juan, PR 00910

Cooperativa de Medicos Gastroenterologos doing business as GASTROCOOP

Cooperativa de Cardiologos de PR doing business as CARDIOCOOP

Po Box 367328

San Juan, PR 00936-7328

Cooperativa de Medicos Oftalmologos de Puerto Rico doing business as OFTACOOP

Po Box 10001

San Juan, PR 00908-0001

Defendants

Triple-S Advantage, Inc.

MMM Healthcare, LLC

MCS Advantage, Inc.

Humana Health Plans of Puerto Rico, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jaime E. Toro-Monserrate

Attorney at Toro Colon Mullet, PSC

416 Ave Ponce De Leon Ste 311

San Juan, PR 00918-3430

Angel Sosa-Baez

Attorney at Toro, Colon, Mullet, PSC

Po Box 195383

San Juan, PR 00919-5383

Defendant Attorneys

Luis R. Roman-Negron

Attorney at Sanabria Bauermeister Garcia & Berio

P.O.Box. 363068

San Juan, PR 00936-3068

Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais

Attorney at Fernandez & Alcaraz, PSC

Capital Center Bldg. South Tower Suite 202, 239 Arterial Hostos

San Juan, PR 00918-1475

Roberto L. Prats-Palerm

Attorney at RPP Law PSC

1509 Lopez Landron 10Th Floor, American Airlines Bldg. Suite 1000

San Juan, PR 00911

Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Mariacte Correa-Cestero

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) RESPONSE to Motion of Defendant Insurers Opposition to Motion for Remand and Opposition to Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 20] filed by Cooperativa de Cardiologos de PR, Cooperativa de Medicos Gastroenterologos, Cooperativa de Medicos Oftalmologos de Puerto Rico, Cooperativa de Medicos Ortopedas de Puerto Rico Re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cooperativa de Medicos Gastroenterologos, Cooperativa de Medicos Ortopedas de Puerto Rico, Cooperativa de Medicos Oftalmologos de Puerto Rico, Cooperativa de Cardiologos de PR filed by Cooperativa de Cardiologos de PR, Cooperativa de Medicos Gastroenterologos, Cooperativa de Medicos Oftalmologos de Puerto Rico, Cooperativa de Medicos Ortopedas de Puerto Rico. (Toro-Monserrate, Jaime) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#23

(#23) MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to "Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Cross Motion to Dismiss" filed by Jaime E. Toro-Monserrate on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Toro-Monserrate, Jaime) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#20

(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Remand and Cross Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by All Defendants Re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cooperativa de Medicos Gastroenterologos, Cooperativa de Medicos Ortopedas de Puerto Rico, Cooperativa de Medicos Oftalmologos de Puerto Rico, Cooperativa de Cardiologos de PR filed by All Defendants. (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#19

(#19) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Defendants Second Request for a Extension of Time to address Motion to Remand filed by Jaime E. Toro-Monserrate on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/19/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Toro-Monserrate, Jaime) Modified on 8/6/2020 to replace all caps text. (mg). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto L. Prats-Palerm on behalf of MMM Healthcare, LLC (Prats-Palerm, Roberto) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#17

(#17) MOTION for extension of time until August 10, 2020 to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead and Respond in Opposittion to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 8/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time until August 5, 2020 to File Response/Reply in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais on behalf of All Defendants. Responses due by 8/3/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio) Modified on 7/21/2020 to edit docket text (vso). (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#13

(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time until August 5, 2020 to File Response/Reply in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais on behalf of All Defendants. Responses due by 8/3/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio) Modified on 7/21/2020 to edit docket text (vso). (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#2

(#15) ORDER granting #12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until August 5, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead; granting #2 MOTION To Include Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet to Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 7/13/2020. (MQ) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

1 #9

Exhibit Act 90-2019

1 #8

Exhibit Certified English Translation Act 90-2019

1 #7

Exhibit Complaint in 19-cv-1940

1 #6

Exhibit original Order to Show Cause

1 #5

Exhibit Certified English Translation Order to Show Cause

1 #4

Exhibit Original Service of Summons

1 #3

Exhibit Certified English Translation Service of Summons

1 #1

Exhibit Certified English Translation of State Complaint

#1

(#4) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Summons as to MCS and Certified English Translation) re #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Triple-S Advantage, Inc., MMM Healthcare, LLC, MCS Advantage, Inc., Humana Health Plans of Puerto Rico, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Casellas-Santana, Ricardo) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE to Motion of Defendant Insurers Opposition to Motion for Remand and Opposition to Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 20] filed by Cooperativa de Cardiologos de PR, Cooperativa de Medicos Gastroenterologos, Cooperativa de Medicos Oftalmologos de Puerto Rico, Cooperativa de Medicos Ortopedas de Puerto Rico Re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cooperativa de Medicos Gastroenterologos, Cooperativa de Medicos Ortopedas de Puerto Rico, Cooperativa de Medicos Oftalmologos de Puerto Rico, Cooperativa de Cardiologos de PR filed by Cooperativa de Cardiologos de PR, Cooperativa de Medicos Gastroenterologos, Cooperativa de Medicos Oftalmologos de Puerto Rico, Cooperativa de Medicos Ortopedas de Puerto Rico. (Toro-Monserrate, Jaime) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to "Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Cross Motion to Dismiss" filed by Jaime E. Toro-Monserrate on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Toro-Monserrate, Jaime) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER noted #19 INFORMATIVE motion regarding Defendants Second Request for a Extension of Time to address Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 08/11/2020. (lir) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.); granting #17 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 08/11/2020. (lir) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Remand and Cross Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by All Defendants Re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cooperativa de Medicos Gastroenterologos, Cooperativa de Medicos Ortopedas de Puerto Rico, Cooperativa de Medicos Oftalmologos de Puerto Rico, Cooperativa de Cardiologos de PR filed by All Defendants. (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Defendants Second Request for a Extension of Time to address Motion to Remand filed by Jaime E. Toro-Monserrate on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/19/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Toro-Monserrate, Jaime) Modified on 8/6/2020 to replace all caps text. (mg). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto L. Prats-Palerm on behalf of MMM Healthcare, LLC (Prats-Palerm, Roberto) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for extension of time until August 10, 2020 to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead and Respond in Opposittion to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 8/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time until August 5, 2020 to File Response/Reply in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais on behalf of All Defendants. Responses due by 8/3/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio) Modified on 7/21/2020 to edit docket text (vso). (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until August 5, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead; granting #2 MOTION To Include Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet to Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 7/13/2020. (MQ) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime E. Toro-Monserrate on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Toro-Monserrate, Jaime) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to transfer case filed by Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 7/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mariacte Correa-Cestero on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc. (Correa-Cestero, Mariacte) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Triple-S Advantage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PR Court Summons, #2 Exhibit Summons-Certified Translation) (Roman-Negron, Luis) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Luis R. Roman-Negron on behalf of Triple-S Advantage, Inc. (Roman-Negron, Luis) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Summons as to MCS and Certified English Translation) re #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Triple-S Advantage, Inc., MMM Healthcare, LLC, MCS Advantage, Inc., Humana Health Plans of Puerto Rico, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Casellas-Santana, Ricardo) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc. (Casellas-Santana, Ricardo) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION To Include Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Triple-S Advantage, Inc., MMM Healthcare, LLC, MCS Advantage, Inc., Humana Health Plans of Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 7/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance, case number SJ2020CV03022. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6929497), filed by MMM Healthcare, LLC, Humana Health Plans of Puerto Rico, Inc., Triple-S Advantage, Inc., MCS Advantage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified English Translation of State Complaint, #2 Exhibit Original State Complaint, #3 Exhibit Certified English Translation Service of Summons, #4 Exhibit Original Service of Summons, #5 Exhibit Certified English Translation Order to Show Cause, #6 Exhibit original Order to Show Cause, #7 Exhibit Complaint in 19-cv-1940, #8 Exhibit Certified English Translation Act 90-2019, #9 Exhibit Act 90-2019)(Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Triple-S Advantage, Inc. is a litigant