This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2022 at 08:17:35 (UTC).

Cooper v. The Kroger Co. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Cooper filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Kroger Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leigh Martin May. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00069

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnny Cooper

Defendants

The Kroger Co.

The Kroger Co. Zero Hunger 1 Zero Waste Foundation

ABC Corporations X-Z

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason M. Ferguson

Attorney at Law Office of Jason M. Ferguson, LLC

P.O. Box 1929

Tifton, GA 31793

Robert Robinson McLendon, IV

Attorney at Robert R. McLendon, IV Attorney at Law

Suite C150 Court Square

Blakely, GA 39823

Defendant Attorneys

Dorothy Paul

Attorney at Gray Rust St. Amand Moffett & Brieske, LLP

Suite 1700, Salesforce Tower Atlanta950 East Paces Ferry Rd., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326

Jeffrey Mittar Wasick

Attorney at Gray Rust St. Amand Moffett & Brieske, LLP

Suite 1700, Salesforce Tower Atlanta950 East Paces Ferry Rd., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326

Matthew G. Moffett

Attorney at Gray, Rust, St. Amand, Moffett & Brieske, LLP

950 East Paces Ferry Roadsuite 1700 - Salesforce Tower Atlanta

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Johnny Cooper.(McLendon, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Johnny Cooper. (McLendon, Robert) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Johnny Cooper. (McLendon, Robert) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO #6 SHOW CAUSE filed by Johnny Cooper. (McLendon, Robert) Modified on 2/1/2022 to add document link. (aaq). (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Robinson McLendon, IV on behalf of Johnny Cooper (McLendon, Robert) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER that the Plaintiff has through 2/28/2022 to respond to the #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/31/2022. (anc) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by The Kroger Co. Zero Hunger 1 Zero Waste Foundation.(Paul, Dorothy) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by The Kroger Co..(Lisle, Sarah Raquel) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to to show cause within 7 days of the entry of this Order, why the motion to dismiss should not be granted as unopposed. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit the matter to the undersigned upon theexpiration of the response period. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/25/2022. (anc) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/10/2022. (cmd) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by The Kroger Co. and The Kroger Co. Zero Hunger 1 Zero Waste Foundation. (eop) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

3 #1

Jury Demand

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Kroger Co. and The Kroger Co. Zero Hunger 1 Zero Waste Foundation. Discovery ends on 6/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#2

(#2) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Memorandum In Support by The Kroger Co. and The Kroger Co. Zero Hunger 1 Zero Waste Foundation. (eop) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit -B -Plaintiff's Demand

1 #1

Exhibit -A -All Pleadings Filed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Johnny Cooper.(McLendon, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Johnny Cooper. (McLendon, Robert) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Johnny Cooper. (McLendon, Robert) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #6 Order to Show Cause to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (bnp) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO #6 SHOW CAUSE filed by Johnny Cooper. (McLendon, Robert) Modified on 2/1/2022 to add document link. (aaq). (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Robinson McLendon, IV on behalf of Johnny Cooper (McLendon, Robert) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Counsel for Johnny Cooper re #9 Order (anc) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER that the Plaintiff has through 2/28/2022 to respond to the #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/31/2022. (anc) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by The Kroger Co. Zero Hunger 1 Zero Waste Foundation.(Paul, Dorothy) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by The Kroger Co..(Lisle, Sarah Raquel) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jason M. Ferguson counsel for Johnny Cooper re #6 Order to Show Cause. (anc) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to to show cause within 7 days of the entry of this Order, why the motion to dismiss should not be granted as unopposed. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit the matter to the undersigned upon theexpiration of the response period. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/25/2022. (anc) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (bnp) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to counsel for Johnny Cooper re #5 Standing Order. (cmd) Modified on 1/10/2022 (cmd). (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/10/2022. (cmd) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by The Kroger Co. and The Kroger Co. Zero Hunger 1 Zero Waste Foundation. (eop) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Kroger Co. and The Kroger Co. Zero Hunger 1 Zero Waste Foundation. Discovery ends on 6/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Memorandum In Support by The Kroger Co. and The Kroger Co. Zero Hunger 1 Zero Waste Foundation. (eop) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by The Kroger Co. and The Kroger Co. Zero Hunger 1 Zero Waste Foundation. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11501204) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -All Pleadings Filed, #2 Exhibit -B -Plaintiff's Demand, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 1/7/2022 (eop). (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey M. Wasick

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew G. Moffett