This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2021 at 09:00:25 (UTC).

Cooper v. Spartanburg County Coroner's Office et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Cooper filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Spartanburg County Coroner's Office. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McDonald and Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-03857

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kevin McDonald

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristie Cooper

Campobello, SC 29322

Defendants

Spartanburg County

Spartanburg County Coroner's Office

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 12/23/2020. The plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (doc. 3) is therefore granted. 5e Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/2/2020. (kric, ) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Dismissal and Notice of Rights

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Spartanburg County, Spartanburg County Coroner's Office, filed by Kristie Cooper. Service due by 2/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Envelope)(kric, ) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Kristie Cooper 925 Loop Road Campobello, SC 29322 with blank summons and USM285 forms (kric, ) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 12/23/2020. The plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (doc. 3) is therefore granted. 5e Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/2/2020. (kric, ) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Kristie Cooper. Response to Motion due by 11/16/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, ) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Spartanburg County, Spartanburg County Coroner's Office, filed by Kristie Cooper. Service due by 2/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Envelope)(kric, ) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPARTANBURG COUNTY is a litigant