This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 10:26:30 (UTC).

Cooper v. Cornerstone Chemical Company

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 Cooper filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Cornerstone Chemical Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah S. Vance and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01454

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah S. Vance

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mr. James L Cooper

James L. Cooper

Defendants

Cornerstone Chemical

Cornerstone Chemical Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Victor Roma Farrugia

Attorney at Farrugia Law Firm, LLC

1340 Poydras Street, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70112

Defendant Attorneys

Kristyn Lambert

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart (New Orleans)

701 Poydras St., Suite 3500

New Orleans, LA 70139

Christopher E. Moore

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart (New Orleans)

701 Poydras St., Suite 3500

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2020 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/10/2020.(jjs) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cornerstone Chemical Company.(Moore, Christopher) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Cornerstone Chemical Company; answer due 7/8/2020. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/18/2020. (mm) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by James L. Cooper re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farrugia, Victor) Modified event on 6/18/2020 (mm). (Entered: 06/18/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Cornerstone Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Serve Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Cornerstone Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Christopher E. Moore added to party Cornerstone Chemical Company(pty:dft).(Moore, Christopher) Modified text on 6/17/2020 (mm). (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Cornerstone Chemical Company. (mm) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Cornerstone Chemical Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8304144) filed by James L Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney Victor Roma Farrugia added to party James L Cooper(pty:pla).(Farrugia, Victor) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/15/2020) (mm). (Entered: 05/14/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2020 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/10/2020.(jjs) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cornerstone Chemical Company.(Moore, Christopher) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Response to Motion. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Cornerstone Chemical Company; answer due 7/8/2020. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/18/2020. (mm) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by James L. Cooper re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farrugia, Victor) Modified event on 6/18/2020 (mm). (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Cornerstone Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Serve Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Cornerstone Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Christopher E. Moore added to party Cornerstone Chemical Company(pty:dft).(Moore, Christopher) Modified text on 6/17/2020 (mm). (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Cornerstone Chemical Company. (mm) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Cornerstone Chemical Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8304144) filed by James L Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney Victor Roma Farrugia added to party James L Cooper(pty:pla).(Farrugia, Victor) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/15/2020) (mm). (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less