This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/10/2022 at 09:00:50 (UTC).

Cooper v. Chickasaw Council of Boy Scouts of America et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 Cooper filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Chickasaw Council of Boy Scouts of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Annie T. Christoff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02224

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John T. Fowlkes, Jr

Referral Judge

Annie T. Christoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Holly A Cooper

Defendants

Chickasaw Council of Boy Scouts of America

Boy Scouts of America

Not Classified By Court

Clerk W. Aaron Hall

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mathew R Zenner

Attorney at ZENNER LAW, PLLC

320 Seven Springs Way, Suite 250

Brentwood, TN 37027

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Kimberly Hodges

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART

6410 Poplar Avenue, International Place Tower Ii

Memphis, TN 38119

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A to NOR - State Court Record

1 #2

Exhibit B to NOR - NONOR

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (agj) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (proposed order submitted) by Boy Scouts of America, Chickasaw Council of Boy Scouts of America. (Hodges, Melissa) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Supplemental Certificate of Consultation for Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Boy Scouts of America, Chickasaw Council of Boy Scouts of America. (Hodges, Melissa) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Chickasaw Council of Boy Scouts of America.(Hodges, Melissa) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Boy Scouts of America.(Hodges, Melissa) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#12

(#12) SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference is set for Tuesday, 6/21/2022 at 09:00 AM via TEAMS before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes' scheduling guidelines at the website@https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn.Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (ljf) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference is set for Tuesday, 6/21/2022 at 09:00 AM via TEAMS before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes' scheduling guidelines at the website@https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn.Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (ljf) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Boy Scouts of America.(Hodges, Melissa) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Chickasaw Council of Boy Scouts of America.(Hodges, Melissa) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Docket(#9) Defendants move unopposed for an extension of time to respond to Complaint. (ECF Nos. 7 & 8.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the Motion and extends Defendants time to answer or respond to Complaint up to and including May 11, 2022. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 5/5/2022. (Fowlkes, J.) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Supplemental Certificate of Consultation for Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Boy Scouts of America, Chickasaw Council of Boy Scouts of America. (Hodges, Melissa) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (proposed order submitted) by Boy Scouts of America, Chickasaw Council of Boy Scouts of America. (Hodges, Melissa) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Chickasaw Council of Boy Scouts of America has been filed. For future reference, please note the civil cover sheet has a hand written signature and not the required electronic signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (agj) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (agj) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Chancery Court of Shelby County, Tennessee, case number CH-22-0305 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3851698), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to NOR - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B to NOR - NONOR, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hodges, Melissa) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boy Scouts of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Kimberly Hodges