This case was last updated from PACER on 09/01/2021 at 05:50:47 (UTC).

Cooper v. Amazon.com Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Cooper filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Amazon com Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elaine E. Bucklo and Young B. Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04633

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

Referral Judge

Young B. Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carol Cooper

Defendants

Amazon.com Inc

Amazon.com Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cecily Jordan

Attorney at TOUSLEY BRAIN STEPHENS

1200 Fifth Ave Ste 1700

Seattle, WA 98101

Edward D. Robertson, III

Attorney at Bartimus, Frickleton, Robertson & Gorny - Leawood

11150 Overbrook Drive, Suite 250

Leawood, KS 66211

James P. Frickleton

Attorney at BARTIMUS, FRICKLETON LAW FIRM

11150 Overbrook Road, Suite 200

Leawood, KS 66211

Kevin P. Green

Attorney at Goldenberg Heller & Antognoli, PC

2227 South State Route 157

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Thomas P. Rosenfeld

Attorney at Goldenberg Heller et al.

2227 South State Route 157, P.O. Box 959

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Jason T. Dennett

Attorney at Tousley Brain Stephens Pllc

1700 7Th Avenue, Suite 2200

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

Jedediah Wakefield

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

555 California St

San Francisco, CA 94104

Laurence F Pulgram

Attorney at Fenwick & West Llp

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Brian D Buckley

Attorney at FENWICK & WEST (WA)

1191 Second Ave, 10Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ORDER granting Parties' #23 Stipulated Motion to Transfer Venue. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). All dates on this Court's calendar for this action shall be withdrawn in light of the transfer. The case will be transferred by electronic case transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR) (Main Document 24 replaced on 8/13/2021) (SR). Modified on 8/13/2021 to replace document with corrected document title name, no other changes made (SR). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 08/13/2021)

25 #1

*Restricted*

#23

(#23) Stipulated MOTION to Transfer Venue and [Proposed] Order, filed by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. Noting Date 7/30/2021, (Buckley, Brian) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#20

(#20) WAIVER of the Service of Summons on Defendant Amazon.com, Inc by Plaintiff Carol Cooper. Waiver sent 7/14/2021 (Dennett, Jason) Modified on 7/15/2021 (MW). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#19

(#19) WAIVER of the Service of Summons on Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC by Plaintiff Carol Cooper. Waiver sent 7/14/2021 (Dennett, Jason) Modified on 7/15/2021 (MW). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#14

(#17) ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James P Frickleton for Plaintiff Carol Cooper, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#13

No Description Available

#12

(#16) ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas P Rosenfeld for Plaintiff Carol Cooper, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#11

No Description Available

#9

(#9) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jedediah Wakefield FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7161617 (Buckley, Brian) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#7

(#8) ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Laurence F. Pulgram for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, and Amazon.com Services LLC, by Clerk William M McCool Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) Modified on 7/13/2021 (DS). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian D Buckley on behalf of Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. (Buckley, Brian) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#5

(#5) MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Gabriel_Traber@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 10/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Carol Cooper. (Dennett, Jason) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/12/2021 to flatten malformed PDF) (KB). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Civil Cover Sheet Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#1

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Carol Cooper. (Dennett, Jason) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/12/2021 to flatten malformed PDF) (KB). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RECEIVED from Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-00915 (gcy) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting Parties' #23 Stipulated Motion to Transfer Venue. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). All dates on this Court's calendar for this action shall be withdrawn in light of the transfer. The case will be transferred by electronic case transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR) (Main Document 24 replaced on 8/13/2021) (SR). Modified on 8/13/2021 to replace document with corrected document title name, no other changes made (SR). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Stipulated MOTION to Transfer Venue and [Proposed] Order, filed by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. Noting Date 7/30/2021, (Buckley, Brian) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Buckley, Brian) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Edward D Robertson, III for Plaintiff Carol Cooper, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) WAIVER of the Service of Summons on Defendant Amazon.com, Inc by Plaintiff Carol Cooper. Waiver sent 7/14/2021 (Dennett, Jason) Modified on 7/15/2021 (MW). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER of the Service of Summons on Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC by Plaintiff Carol Cooper. Waiver sent 7/14/2021 (Dennett, Jason) Modified on 7/15/2021 (MW). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Edward D. Robertson III FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Carol Cooper (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7166197 (Dennett, Jason) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James P Frickleton for Plaintiff Carol Cooper, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas P Rosenfeld for Plaintiff Carol Cooper, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jedediah Wakefield FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7161617 (Buckley, Brian) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Laurence F. Pulgram for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, and Amazon.com Services LLC, by Clerk William M McCool Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) Modified on 7/13/2021 (DS). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Laurence F. Pulgram FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7161337 (Buckley, Brian) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian D Buckley on behalf of Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. (Buckley, Brian) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Gabriel_Traber@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 10/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Carol Cooper. (Dennett, Jason) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/12/2021 to flatten malformed PDF) (KB). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Civil Cover Sheet Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketU.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (RE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7157927) Attorney Jason T Dennett added to party Carol Cooper(pty:pla), filed by Carol Cooper.(Dennett, Jason) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/31/2021.] (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laurence F. Pulgram Esquire