This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2020 at 07:47:22 (UTC).

Cooper, Jr. v. Schneider National Carriers, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 Cooper, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Schneider National Carriers, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05738

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alvin Cooper, Jr.

Defendants

Schneider National Carriers, Inc.

INS Insurance, Inc.

Craig Joseph Whitlow

Old Republic Insurance Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter A. Law

Attorney at Law & Moran

563 Spring St., N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30308

Elizabeth A. Rose

Attorney at Law & Moran

563 Spring St., N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30308

Defendant Attorneys

John D. Dixon

Attorney at Dennis Corry Smith & Dixon, LLP- ATL

Suite 1400, 900 Circle 75 Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339

Melody H. Demasi

Attorney at Dennis Corry Smith & Dixon, LLP- ATL

Suite 1400, 900 Circle 75 Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #6

Exhibit F - Secretary of State Record for INS Insurance, Inc.

1 #5

Exhibit E - Secretary of State Record for Old Republic Insurance Co.

1 #2

Exhibit B - Answer of Schneider National Carriers, Inc., Craig Joseph Whitlow,

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint and other documents filed in case

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE by Alvin Cooper, Jr. Notice of Issuance of Subpoena (Rose, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Melody H. Demasi on behalf of Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Demasi, Melody) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Defendant Schneider National Carriers, Inc.'s First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Alvin Cooper, Jr..(Demasi, Melody) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action filed by INS Insurance, Inc., Old Republic Insurance Co., Schneider National Carriers, Inc., Craig Joseph Whitlow (Demasi, Melody) Modified to edit text on 2/4/2020 (ah). (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Notation re #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement: OK, per TWT. (cmd) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Alvin Cooper, Jr..(Rose, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 11, 2020, through March 26, 2020, by John D. Dixon. (Dixon, John) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Disclosures by Alvin Cooper, Jr..(Rose, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alvin Cooper, Jr. by Alvin Cooper, Jr..(Rose, Elizabeth) Modified to edit text on 1/21/2020 (ah). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Alvin Cooper, Jr.. (Rose, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons: OK, per TWT. (cmd) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Disclosures by INS Insurance, Inc., Old Republic Insurance Co., Schneider National Carriers, Inc., Craig Joseph Whitlow.(Demasi, Melody). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Craig Joseph Whitlow. Craig Joseph Whitlow served on 1/7/2020. (Bedford, Nicholas) Modified to edit filer information on 1/8/2020 (ah). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by INS Insurance, Inc., Old Republic Insurance Co., Schneider National Carriers, Inc., Craig Joseph Whitlow identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National Carriers, Inc. for INS Insurance, Inc., Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Demasi, Melody) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint within #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by INS Insurance, Inc., Old Republic Insurance Co., Schneider National Carriers, Inc., and Craig Joseph Whitlow. Discovery ends on 5/18/2020. (Originally filed in State Court on 12/20/2019) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc., Craig Joseph Whitlow, Old Republic Insurance Co., and INS Insurance, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9199440). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint and other documents filed in case, #2 Exhibit B - Answer of Schneider National Carriers, Inc., Craig Joseph Whitlow, Old Republic Co., and INS Insurance, Inc., #3 Exhibit C - Georgia Motor Vehicle Crash Report, #4 Exhibit D - Secretary of State Record for Schneider National Carriers, Inc., #5 Exhibit E - Secretary of State Record for Old Republic Insurance Co., #6 Exhibit F - Secretary of State Record for INS Insurance, Inc., #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INS Insurance, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Old Republic Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melody H. Demasi