This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2021 at 09:11:09 (UTC).

Cooper et al v. Chris Brown Entertainment, LLC et al

Case Summary

This is an action by Plaintiffs against Defendants which alleges that Defendants unlawfully exploited the I Love Your Dress, and they have allegedly -with actual knowledge and fraudulent intent- infringed upon, and continue to infringe upon, Plaintiffs’ common law and statutory copyrights for the Work, causing serious and significant injury to Plaintiffs.

In the complaint, Plaintiffs alleged that, “During the relevant time period, Defendants, and each of them, made copies of No Guidance and sold, reproduced, distributed, publicly performed, streamed, broadcasted, licensed, displayed, used, and/or otherwise commercial exploited No Guidance without Plaintiffs’ consent. Defendants never received permission, authorization, consent, or even a license from Plaintiffs to interpolate, sample, use, or copy the Work, in whole or in part.”

Plaintiffs also alleged that, “During the relevant time period, Defendants, and each of them, with knowledge of the infringement at issue, took material steps to copy the Work to create and subsequently use and monetize No Guidance. In doing so, Defendants contributed to one another’s infringement by assisting in the obtainment and copying of material portions of the Work.  During the relevant time period, Defendants, and each of them, financially benefited from the known infringement at issue and had the ability to supervise, oversee, and control the infringing conduct that gave rise to the creation and subsequent use and monetization of No Guidance.”

Further, Plaintiffs alleged that, “During the relevant time period, Defendants further infringed upon the Common Law Copyright when they issued and/or authorized others to issue licenses to third parties for the use, publication, and exploitation of No Guidance or established royalty splits with co-Defendants not entitled to illegal revenues generated by No Guidance. These license and agreements were issued without any consent, authority, or approval from Plaintiffs.”

There are six claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiffs. The first, second and third claims alleged are for copyright infringement. The fourth claim is for declaratory judgment, the fifth claim is a demand for accounting and the sixth claim alleged is for unjust enrichment.

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiffs have requested the Court to pass an award of damages in an amount to be determined at trial and declaring that, given the nature and extent of Defendants’ infringement with respect to the Work, Plaintiffs are entitled to no less than fifty percent (50%) of the publishing and other revenues derived from No Guidance. Further, Plaintiffs requested the Court for a judgment awarding punitive damages, pre-judgment and post-judgment interest, attorneys’ fees, costs, expenses, disbursements and any further relief as the Court may deem just and proper. 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-81870

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DRUM

Defendants

CHRISTOPHER MAURICE BROWN

AUBREY DRAKE GRAHAM

ANDERSON HERNANDEZ

JOSHUA LOUIS HUIZAR

TRAVIS DARELLE WALTON

NIJA CHARLES

TYLER BRYANT

MICHEE PATRICK LEBRUN

CHRIS BROWN ENTERTAINMENT, LLC doing business as CHRISTOPHER BROWN ENTERTAINMENT, LLC,

CHRIS BROWN

DRAKE

VINYLZ

J-LOUIS

TEDDY WALTON

NIJA

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Neil Barry Solomon

Attorney at McLauglin & Stern, LLP

525 Okeechobee Blvd, Suite 1700

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Chester R. Ostrowski

Attorney at McLaughlin & Stern LLP

260 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Jason S. Giaimo

Attorney at McLaughlin & Stern, LLP

260 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Defendant Attorneys

Ilene S. Farkas

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

James George Sammataro

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

201 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 2700

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) First MOTION for Extension of Time extend time to file joint scheduling order re #10 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Timothy L. Valentine. Responses due by 12/17/2021 (Solomon, Neil) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ilene S. Farkas. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # BFLSDC-15197894 by Amnija, LLC, Christopher Maurice Brown, Nija Charles, Chris Brown Entertainment, LLC, Culture Beyond Ur Experience, Anderson Hernandez, Joshua Louis Huizar, J-Louis Productions, LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Vinylz Music Group LLC. Attorney James George Sammataro added to party Christopher Maurice Brown(pty:dft), Attorney James George Sammataro added to party Nija Charles(pty:dft), Attorney James George Sammataro added to party Culture Beyond Ur Experience(pty:dft), Attorney James George Sammataro added to party Anderson Hernandez(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/7/2021 (Sammataro, James) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

14 #2

Text of Proposed Order

14 #1

Certification

14 #14

Main Document

13 #2

Text of Proposed Order

13 #1

Certification

13 #13

Main Document

#10

(#18) First MOTION for Extension of Time extend time to file joint scheduling order re #10 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Timothy L. Valentine. Responses due by 12/17/2021 (Solomon, Neil) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

9 #8

Affidavit J-Louis Productions, LLC

9 #6

Affidavit Vinylz Music Group LLC

9 #3

Affidavit Sony Music Entertainment d/b/a RCA Records

#7

(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint on or before December 17, 2021.For clarity of the record, Plaintiffs are directed to file proof of service of process on or before November 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/15/2021. (rm02) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER to Perfect Service. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#5

4 #1

Complaint

4 #4

Main Document

#3

42 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall comply with the Court's #10 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties on or before January 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/3/2021. (rm02) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) First MOTION for Extension of Time extend time to file joint scheduling order re #10 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Timothy L. Valentine. Responses due by 12/17/2021 (Solomon, Neil) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Ilene S. Farkas. The Clerk is directed to provide Notices of Electronic Filing to Ms. Farkas at email address ifarkas@pryorcashman.com. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/24/2021. (rm02) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ilene S. Farkas. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # BFLSDC-15197894 by Amnija, LLC, Christopher Maurice Brown, Nija Charles, Chris Brown Entertainment, LLC, Culture Beyond Ur Experience, Anderson Hernandez, Joshua Louis Huizar, J-Louis Productions, LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Vinylz Music Group LLC. Attorney James George Sammataro added to party Christopher Maurice Brown(pty:dft), Attorney James George Sammataro added to party Nija Charles(pty:dft), Attorney James George Sammataro added to party Culture Beyond Ur Experience(pty:dft), Attorney James George Sammataro added to party Anderson Hernandez(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/7/2021 (Sammataro, James) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PAPERLESS ORDER. Defendants' #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Chester R. Ostrowski is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to provide Notices of Electronic Filing to Mr. Ostrowski at email address costrowski@mclaughlinstern.com. Defendants' #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jason S. Giaimo is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to provide Notices of Electronic Filing to Mr. Giaimo at email address jgiaimo@mclaughlinstern.com. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/23/2021. (rm02) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jason S. Giaimo. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15196306 by Braindon N. Cooper, Signature Seriez Entertainment, Inc., Timothy L. Valentine. Responses due by 12/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomon, Neil) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Chester R. Ostrowski. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15196276 by Braindon N. Cooper, Timothy L. Valentine. Responses due by 12/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomon, Neil) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketReset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Amnija, LLC response/answer due 12/17/2021; Joshua Louis Huizar response/answer due 12/17/2021; J-Louis Productions, LLC response/answer due 12/17/2021; Vinylz Music Group LLC response/answer due 12/17/2021. (ls)(per DE #12) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint on or before December 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/17/2021. (rm02) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,,,, by AMNIJA, LLC, JOSHUA LOUIS HUIZAR, J-LOUIS PRODUCTIONS, LLC, VINYLZ MUSIC GROUP LLC. Attorney James George Sammataro added to party AMNIJA, LLC (pty:dft), Attorney James George Sammataro added to party JOSHUA LOUIS HUIZAR(pty:dft), Attorney James George Sammataro added to party J-LOUIS PRODUCTIONS, LLC (pty:dft), Attorney James George Sammataro added to party VINYLZ MUSIC GROUP LLC(pty:dft). (Sammataro, James) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/6/2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by BRAINDON N COOPER, TIMOTHY L VALENTINE. AMNIJA, LLC served on 10/26/2021, response/answer due 11/16/2021; CHRIS BROWN ENTERTAINMENT, LLC served on 10/26/2021, response/answer due 11/16/2021; CULTURE BEYOND UR EXPERIENCE served on 10/28/2021, response/answer due 11/18/2021; JOSHUA LOUIS HUIZAR served on 10/27/2021, response/answer due 11/17/2021; J-LOUIS PRODUCTIONS, LLC served on 10/27/2021, response/answer due 11/17/2021; MICHEE PATRICK LEBRUN served on 11/8/2021, response/answer due 11/29/2021; MAVOR & MOSES PUBLISHING, LLC served on 10/27/2021, response/answer due 11/17/2021; SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., served on 10/28/2021, response/answer due 11/18/2021; SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT served on 10/26/2021, response/answer due 11/16/2021; SONY/ATV SONGS LLC served on 10/26/2021, response/answer due 11/16/2021; VINYLZ MUSIC GROUP LLC served on 10/26/2021, response/answer due 11/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chris Brown Entertainment, LLC, #2 Affidavit Sony/ATV Songs LLC, #3 Affidavit Sony Music Entertainment d/b/a RCA Records, #4 Affidavit Amnija LLC d/b/a Songs of Amnija, #5 Affidavit Mavor & Moses Publishing, LLC, #6 Affidavit Vinylz Music Group LLC, #7 Affidavit Culture Beyond Ur Experience, #8 Affidavit J-Louis Productions, LLC, #9 Affidavit Joshua Louis Huizar, a/k/a J-Louis, #10 Affidavit Michee Patrick Lebrun a/k/a Che Ecru, #11 Affidavit Songs of Universal, Inc.)(Solomon, Neil) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint on or before December 17, 2021.For clarity of the record, Plaintiffs are directed to file proof of service of process on or before November 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/15/2021. (rm02) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,,,, by CHRIS BROWN ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC.,, SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC. Attorney James George Sammataro added to party CHRIS BROWN ENTERTAINMENT, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James George Sammataro added to party SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., (pty:dft), Attorney James George Sammataro added to party SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT (pty:dft), Attorney James George Sammataro added to party SONY/ATV SONGS LLC(pty:dft). (Sammataro, James) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER to Perfect Service. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Chester R. Ostrowski and Jason S. Giaimo, mailing date October 6, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (jbs) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to 1DAMENTIONAL PUBLISHING, LLC, AMNIJA, LLC, CHRISTOPHER MAURICE BROWN, TYLER BRYANT, NIJA CHARLES, CHRIS BROWN ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, CULTURE BEYOND UR EXPERIENCE, AUBREY DRAKE GRAHAM, ANDERSON HERNANDEZ, JOSHUA LOUIS HUIZAR, J-LOUIS PRODUCTIONS, LLC, MICHEE PATRICK LEBRUN, MAVOR & MOSES PUBLISHING, LLC, NOAH SHEBIB, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC.,, SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, VINYLZ MUSIC GROUP LLC, TRAVIS DARELLE WALTON. (jbs) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against 1DAMENTIONAL PUBLISHING, LLC, AMNIJA, LLC, CHRISTOPHER MAURICE BROWN, TYLER BRYANT, NIJA CHARLES, CHRIS BROWN ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, CULTURE BEYOND UR EXPERIENCE, AUBREY DRAKE GRAHAM, ANDERSON HERNANDEZ, JOSHUA LOUIS HUIZAR, J-LOUIS PRODUCTIONS, LLC, MICHEE PATRICK LEBRUN, MAVOR & MOSES PUBLISHING, LLC, NOAH SHEBIB, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC.,, SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, VINYLZ MUSIC GROUP LLC, TRAVIS DARELLE WALTON. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15069862, filed by BRAINDON N COOPER, TIMOTHY L VALENTINE, SIGNATURE SERIEZ ENTERTAINMENT, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Chris Brown Entertainment, #3 Summon(s) Chris Brown, #4 Summon(s) Drake, #5 Summon(s) Anderson Hernandez, #6 Summon(s) Joshua Luis Huizar, #7 Summon(s) Travis Darelle Walton, #8 Summon(s) Nija Charles, #9 Summon(s) Tyler Bryant, #10 Summon(s) Michee Patrick Lebrun, #11 Summon(s) Noah Shebib, #12 Summon(s) (J-Louis Productions, LLC, #13 Summon(s) Culture Beyond Ur Experience, #14 Summon(s) Songs of Universal, #15 Summon(s) Amnija, LLC, #16 Summon(s) 1Damentional Publishing, #17 Summon(s) Mavor & Moses, #18 Summon(s) Sony ATV Songs LLC, #19 Summon(s) Vinylz Music Group, #20 Summon(s) Sony Music Entertainment)(Solomon, Neil) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DRUM is a litigant

Latest cases where DRAKE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil Barry Solomon