This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:10:13 (UTC).

Cooper et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Personal Injury - Marine case was filed by Cooper in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00242

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

B Janice Ellington

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Counter Defendants

Justin Lee Cooper

Crystal Dawn Cooper

Claimants and Counter Claimants

Ronald Guse

Patrick Williams

Jordan Sellers

John Rester

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Sean Burton Swords to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(dterrell, 2) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Sean Burton Swords to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to B Janice Ellington. by Patrick Williams, Ronald Guse, John Rester, Jordan Sellers, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2019. (Wenholz, David) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

11 #2

Exhibit B

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Justin Lee Cooper, Crystal Dawn Cooper by Ronald Guse, Patrick Williams, Jordan Sellers, John Rester, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Shabot, Samuel) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

11 #4

Exhibit D

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit C

11 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Parties (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23037809) filed by Justin Lee Cooper, Crystal Dawn Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Browning, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) MONITION(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#8

(#8) Amended ORDER DIRECTING CLAIMANTS TO FILE AND MAKE PROOF OF CLAIMS, DIRECTING THE ISSUANCE OF MONITION, AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#7

(#7) Amended PROPOSED ORDER Directing Claimaints to File Claims, Directing Issuance of Monition and Restraining Prosecution of Claims re: #3 MOTION Petitioners' Motion for Order Directing Issuance of Monition, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Browning, Robert) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

3 #2

Exhibit 2

7 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) MOTION Petitioners' Motion for Order Directing Issuance of Monition by Justin Lee Cooper, Crystal Dawn Cooper, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Browning, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Sean Burton Swords to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(dterrell, 2) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Justin Lee Cooper, Crystal Dawn Cooper by Ronald Guse, Patrick Williams, Jordan Sellers, John Rester, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Shabot, Samuel) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Sean Burton Swords to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to B Janice Ellington. by Patrick Williams, Ronald Guse, John Rester, Jordan Sellers, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2019. (Wenholz, David) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MONITION(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Amended ORDER DIRECTING CLAIMANTS TO FILE AND MAKE PROOF OF CLAIMS, DIRECTING THE ISSUANCE OF MONITION, AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Amended PROPOSED ORDER Directing Claimaints to File Claims, Directing Issuance of Monition and Restraining Prosecution of Claims re: #3 MOTION Petitioners' Motion for Order Directing Issuance of Monition, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Browning, Robert) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/28/2019. Discussion held: Mr. Cooper fishing trip, accident, attorney represents 4 out of 5 passengers, letter of under taking, documents that need to be signed by Judge Ramos, publication and claims deadline,. Ms. Eckert will be submitting two documents. Appearances: Darah Eckert.(Digital # 2:18-2:33)(ERO:J.Marks), filed.(legarza, 2) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED INITIAL PRETRIAL AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE. Initial Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington(Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington, filed. (legarza, 2) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amartinez, 2) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION Petitioners' Motion for Order Directing Issuance of Monition by Justin Lee Cooper, Crystal Dawn Cooper, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Browning, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Parties (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23037809) filed by Justin Lee Cooper, Crystal Dawn Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Browning, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.