This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2022 at 08:07:53 (UTC).

Coomer v. Methodist LeBonheur Healthcare

Case Summary

On 02/01/2022 Coomer filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Methodist LeBonheur Healthcare. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Tu M. Pham. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02060

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Justin Ward Coomer

Defendant

Methodist LeBonheur Healthcare

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Alan Matthews

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Robert E. Morelli, III

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YESIER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Robert Emmett Turner, IV

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons To Be Issued

1 #3

Exhibit A-Coomer Consent to Join

#2

(#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (btg) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Methodist LeBonheur Healthcare. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (btg) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of Justin Ward Coomer (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Justin Ward Coomer. Methodist LeBonheur Healthcare waiver sent on 2/3/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Justin Ward Coomer. Methodist LeBonheur Healthcare waiver sent on 2/3/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of Justin Ward Coomer (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Methodist LeBonheur Healthcare. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (btg) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (btg) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Methodist LeBonheur Healthcare (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3800467), filed by Justin Ward Coomer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons To Be Issued, #3 Exhibit A-Coomer Consent to Join)(Matthews, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Methodist Healthcare is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Alan Matthews

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E. Morelli, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Emmett Turner, IV