This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 08:43:02 (UTC).

Cooling v. Encompass Insurance Co of America

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 Cooling filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Encompass Insurance Co of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01199

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arthur Cooling

Defendant

Encompass Insurance Co of America

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew E Lundy

Attorney at Lundy Lundy et al (LC)

P O Box 3010

Lake Charles, LA 70602-3010

Gary Lee Blanchard

Attorney at Lundy Lundy et al (LC)

P O Box 3010

Lake Charles, LA 70602-3010

Kailey Kristine Gallegos

Attorney at Lundy Lundy et al (LC)

P O Box 3010

Lake Charles, LA 70602-3010

Troy Houston Middleton, IV

Attorney at Lundy Lundy et al (LC)

P O Box 3010

Lake Charles, LA 70602-3010

Defendant Attorney

James L Donovan, Jr

Attorney at Donovan & Lawler (MET)

4640 Rye St

Metairie, LA 70006

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Statutory Penalties against Encompass Insurance Co of America (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5091940) filed by Arthur Cooling. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Matthew E Lundy added to party Arthur Cooling(pty:pla))(aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Encompass Insurance Co of America. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Cooling. Encompass Insurance Co of America served on 5/9/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Encompass Insurance Co of America.(Attorney James L Donovan, Jr added to party Encompass Insurance Co of America(pty:dft))(aty,Donovan, James) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Encompass Insurance Co of America identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corp for Encompass Insurance Co of America. (aty,Donovan, James) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Encompass Insurance Co of America identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corp for Encompass Insurance Co of America. (aty,Donovan, James) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Encompass Insurance Co of America.(Attorney James L Donovan, Jr added to party Encompass Insurance Co of America(pty:dft))(aty,Donovan, James) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Cooling. Encompass Insurance Co of America served on 5/9/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Encompass Insurance Co of America. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Statutory Penalties against Encompass Insurance Co of America (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5091940) filed by Arthur Cooling. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Matthew E Lundy added to party Arthur Cooling(pty:pla))(aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cade Richard Cole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick A Juneau, Jr