This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2021 at 08:28:55 (UTC).

Cooke v. AECOM Technology Corp. Long-Term Disability Plan et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Cooke filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against AECOM Technology Corp Long-Term Disability Plan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sallie Kim and William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-06719

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sallie Kim

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terence Cooke

Defendants

AECOM Technology Corp. Long-Term Disability Plan

CIGNA

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nina Rachel Wasow

Attorney at Feinberg Jackson Worthman & Wasow, LLP

2030 Addison Street, Suite 500

Berkeley, CA 94704

Defendant Attorney

Tatiana Semerjian Nunneri

Attorney at Meserve, Mumper & Hughes LLP

1000 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1860

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2457

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2021 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2021. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/14/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

17 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

17 #17

Main Document

#15

(#15) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Nunneri, Tatiana) (Filed on 10/7/2021) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#14

(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/15/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2021. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION re #7 Amended Complaint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Not More Than 30 Days filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Nunneri, Tatiana) (Filed on 10/1/2021) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#12

(#12) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2021) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#11

(#11) Proposed Summons. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 9/22/2021) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#10

(#10) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Terence Cooke as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 9/22/2021) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#9

#Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Summons has already been issued. See ECF No. 8. Re: #9 Proposed Summons filed by Terence Cooke. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#7

(#13) STIPULATION re #7 Amended Complaint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Not More Than 30 Days filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Nunneri, Tatiana) (Filed on 10/1/2021) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#6

#Electronic filing error. Life Insurance Company of North America is not listed as a defendant in the Complaint. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re : #6 Proposed Summons filed by Terence Cooke. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to AECOM Technology Corp. Long-Term Disability Plan, CIGNA. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2021) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 9/1/2021) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2021 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2021. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/14/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/08/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Docket(#16) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2021) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Nunneri, Tatiana) (Filed on 10/7/2021) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/15/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2021. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION re #7 Amended Complaint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Not More Than 30 Days filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Nunneri, Tatiana) (Filed on 10/1/2021) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2021) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Proposed Summons. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 9/22/2021) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Terence Cooke as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 9/22/2021) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Summons has already been issued. See ECF No. 8. Re: #9 Proposed Summons filed by Terence Cooke. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Summons. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 9/21/2021) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against AECOM Technology Corp. Long-Term Disability Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America. Filed byTerence Cooke. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Life Insurance Company of North America is not listed as a defendant in the Complaint. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re : #6 Proposed Summons filed by Terence Cooke. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 9/16/2021) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to AECOM Technology Corp. Long-Term Disability Plan, CIGNA. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2021) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 9/1/2021) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/13/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16336884.). Filed byTerence Cooke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where INA GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tatiana Semerjian Nunneri