This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2022 at 07:39:09 (UTC).

Cook v. XL Specialty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 Cook filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against XL Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Aileen M. Cannon and Bruce E. Reinhart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-82186

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aileen M. Cannon

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christina Cook

Defendant

XL Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Mark Benrubi

Attorney at Benrubi Law, P.A.

1401 Forum Way, Suite 600

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Defendant Attorney

Marlin Kareem Green

Attorney at Brown Sims, PC

4000 Ponce De Leon Blvd, Suite 630

Miami, FL 33146

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #14 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Christina Cook. (Benrubi, Richard) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

14 #1

Exhibit 1 - Release and Settlement Agreement

14 #14

Main Document

13 #1

Exhibit 1 - Release and Settlement Agreement

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) Summons Issued as to XL Specialty Insurance Company. (amb) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Christina Cook (Benrubi, Richard) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Christina Cook (Benrubi, Richard) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

6 #6

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

1 #7

Proposed Summons

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet Civil

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PAPERLESS ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Magistrate Judge Rule 1, it is ORDERED that #14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or, Alternatively, Motion to Compel Arbitration is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for a Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/26/2022. (ad) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING Defendant's #13 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or, alternatively, Motion to Compel Arbitration in light of Defendant's duplicate filing #14 . The Court will consider the identical Motion at #14 . Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/18/2022. (ad) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before February 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/15/2022. (ad) (Entered: 01/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #14 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Christina Cook. (Benrubi, Richard) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by XL Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/24/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Release and Settlement Agreement)(Green, Marlin) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by XL Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney Marlin Kareem Green added to party XL Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/24/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Release and Settlement Agreement)(Green, Marlin) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to XL Specialty Insurance Company. (amb) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Christina Cook (Benrubi, Richard) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Docket(#10) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - The filer needs to use our AO summons form. (amb) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to XL Specialty Insurance Company. (amb) Text Modified on 12/17/2021 (amb). Modified to correctly restrict image on 12/17/2021 (asl). (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Christina Cook (Benrubi, Richard) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • Docket(#7) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from Florida Middle; Case Number 8:21-cv-02845. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua). (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff has now filed a notice, advising the Court that she "mistakenly filed her Complaint in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida and agrees that the case should be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida." (Doc. #4 ). Accordingly, based on this error and the fact that the events underlying this action occurred in Palm Beach County, Florida, the Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, West Palm Beach Division. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/8/2021. (DMD) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of compliance re 3 Order no pdf by Christina Cook (Benrubi, Richard) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENDORSED ORDER: Upon review of the complaint, it appears to the Court that this action should have been filed in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Notably, the boating accident described in the complaint occurred in Palm Beach County, Florida (Doc. #1 at 3-4) and the underlying state court litigation occurred in Palm Beach County, Florida (Doc. # 1-5). Indeed, the heading of the complaint asserts that it is being filed in United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. (Doc. #1 at 1). Accordingly, by December 14, 2021, Plaintiff is directed to explain why this action should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/7/2021. (DMD) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:21-cv-2845-VMC-AEP. (SJB) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against XL Specialty Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19001072) filed by Christina Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Benrubi, Richard) Modified on 12/7/2021 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marlin Kareem Green