This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2020 at 13:20:39 (UTC).

Cook v. UnitedLex Professional Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 Cook filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against UnitedLex Professional Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Broomes and Teresa J. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02250

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Broomes

Referral Judge

Teresa J. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chase Cook

Defendant

UnitedLex Professional Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Greg N. Tourigny

Attorney at The Tourigny Law Firm

4600 Madison Avenue, Suite 810

Kansas City, MO 64112

Daniel W. Craig

Attorney at Donelon, PC - St.Louis

6614 Clayton Road, Suite 320

St.Louis, MO 63117

Brendan J. Donelon

Attorney at Donelon, PC

4600 Madison, Suite 810

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant Attorneys

Meghan Hanson

Polsinelli Pc - 48Th Street, 900 W. 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

Denise K. Drake

Polsinelli Pc - 48Th Street, 900 W. 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration. Counsel for the parties are directed to report to the Court in writing no later than January 11, 2021 concerning the status of the arbitration or within 14 days of any termination of the arbitration proceeding, whichever is earlier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/7/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Joint Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration by Defendant UnitedLex Professional Services, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hanson, Meghan) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/2/2020 for Defendant UnitedLex Professional Services, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/16/2020. (ca) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Denise K. Drake on behalf of UnitedLex Professional Services, LLC. (Drake, Denise) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Meghan Hanson on behalf of UnitedLex Professional Services, LLC. (Hanson, Meghan) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Chase Cook upon UnitedLex Professional Services, LLC served on 5/27/2020, answer due 6/17/2020 (Donelon, Brendan) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Greg N. Tourigny, I on behalf of Chase Cook. (Tourigny, Greg) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to UnitedLex Professional Services, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Chase Cook. (Donelon, Brendan) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5144661.), filed by Chase Cook.(Donelon, Brendan) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel William Craig

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brendan John Donelon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greg N. Tourigny