This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2020 at 12:54:16 (UTC).

Cook v. Saul

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Cook filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M. Burgess. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00168

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M. Burgess

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janae Leireigh Cook

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul B. Eaglin

Attorney at Eaglin Law Office

Po Box 6033

Syracuse, NY 13217-6033

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin J. Groebner

Attorney at Social Security Administration

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2900, M/S 221A

Seattle, WA 98104-7075

Steven E Skrocki

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Anch)

222 West 7Th Avenue, Rm 253 #9

Anchorage, AK 99513

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due w/in 60 days of initial appearance; opening brief due w/in 30 days; answering brief due w/in 30 days; reply w/in 14 days. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 8/27/2020. (JDS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Service to be completed within 90 days; Clerk to issue summonses and send to plaintiff; Answer due 60 days after receipt. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 7/16/2020. (JDS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #9 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (JDS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due w/in 60 days of initial appearance; opening brief due w/in 30 days; answering brief due w/in 30 days; reply w/in 14 days. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 8/27/2020. (JDS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Groebner on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Groebner, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Skrocki on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Skrocki, Steven) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janae Leireigh Cook. Andrew M. Saul served on 7/23/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Eaglin, Paul) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JDS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Service to be completed within 90 days; Clerk to issue summonses and send to plaintiff; Answer due 60 days after receipt. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 7/16/2020. (JDS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unissued summons re Defendant US Attorney for the District of Alaska, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Region X Chief Counsel, SSA, for Comm'r SSA, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Honorable William P. Barr, Esq.)(KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Janae Leireigh Cook.(KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Janae Leireigh Cook.(KMC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/16/2020 to edit dkt text (JDS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less