This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:52:58 (UTC).

Cook v. OneMain Financial Group, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Cook filed an Other lawsuit against OneMain Financial Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eli J. Richardson and Barbara D. Holmes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01084

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Glenn Cook

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Trans Union LLC

OneMain Financial Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frank H. Kerney, III

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan (Tampa Office)

201 N Franklin Street, 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

John D. Willet

Attorney at Evans Petree, PC (Memphis Office)

1715 Aaron Brenner Drive, Suite 800

Memphis, TN 38120

Erin Palmer Polly

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP (Nashville)

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 1600

Nashville, TN 37201

Colin C. Poling

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates, P.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

David M. Anthony

Attorney at Bone, McAllester & Norton, PLLC (Nashville Office)

511 Union Street, Suite 1600

Nashville, TN 37219

Samuel Aitken Morris

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP (Nashville Office)

222 Second Avenue South, Suite 2000

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Summons issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., OneMain Financial Group, LLC and Trans Union LLC. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.)(dt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#13

(#21) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Colin C. Poling to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/10/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#16

NOTICE TO FILER re DE#15 and #16 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (dt) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

13 #2

Attachment Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#1

(#19) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Polly, Erin) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#21

(#21) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Colin C. Poling to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/10/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

13 #1

Attachment Certificate of Good Standing

#23

(#23) ORDER: Before the Court is the unopposed motion of Defendant Onemain Financial Group, LLC to extend their time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint, filed January 16, 2020, Docket Entry No. #22 . The motion is partially GRANTED. Defendant shall have until February 3, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. The initial case management conference remains scheduled for 10:30 a.m, February 4, 2020, in Courtroom No. 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/21/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#22

(#22) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) by OneMain Financial Group, LLC. (Morris, Samuel) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC by Glenn Cook (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Glenn Cook. OneMain Financial Group, LLC served on 12/17/2019. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

15 #1

Attachment Proposed Order

#6

(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/6/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS returned executed by Glenn Cook. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 12/17/2019. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC by Glenn Cook (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER: Before the Court is the unopposed motion of Defendant Onemain Financial Group, LLC to extend their time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint, filed January 16, 2020, Docket Entry No. #22 . The motion is partially GRANTED. Defendant shall have until February 3, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. The initial case management conference remains scheduled for 10:30 a.m, February 4, 2020, in Courtroom No. 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/21/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) by OneMain Financial Group, LLC. (Morris, Samuel) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Colin C. Poling to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/10/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#15 and #16 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (dt) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for John D. Willet, Erin Palmer Polly, Samuel Aitken Morris and David M. Anthony. IN State Bar status verified as active for Colin C. Poling. (dt) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/7/20. (bs) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Polly, Erin) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Polly, Erin) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Palmer Polly on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Polly, Erin) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS returned executed by Glenn Cook. Trans Union LLC served on 12/17/2019. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS returned executed by Glenn Cook. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 12/17/2019. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Glenn Cook. OneMain Financial Group, LLC served on 12/17/2019. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/6/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., OneMain Financial Group, LLC and Trans Union LLC. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.)(dt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Frank H. Kerney, III. (dt) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., OneMain Financial Group, LLC and Trans Union LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3044099), filed by Glenn Cook. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.